Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jorg Sievers (until 2014-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Mirko Slomka (until 2013-12-27) | 1967-09-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Nestor El Maestro (until 2013-12-27) | 1983-03-25 | ||||
Norbert Duwel (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-01-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Florian Fromlowitz (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-07-02 | |||
14 | Markus Miller (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-04-08 | |||
20 | Ron-Robert Zieler (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Emanuel Pogatetz (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-01-16 | |||
5 | Mario Eggimann (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-01-24 | |||
6 | Steven Cherundolo (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-02-19 | |||
15 | Constant Djakpa (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-10-17 | |||
19 | Christian Schulz (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-04-01 | |||
21 | Karim Haggui (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-01-20 | |||
31 | Tim Hofmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-06-09 | |||
35 | Christopher Avevor (until 2012-08-16) | 1992-02-11 | |||
37 | Felix Burmeister (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-03-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Leon Andreasen (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-04-23 | |||
7 | Sergio da Silva Pinto (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-10-16 | |||
8 | Altin Lala (until 2012-06-30) | 1975-11-18 | |||
16 | DaMarcus Beasley (from 2010-08-30) (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-05-24 | |||
17 | Moritz Stoppelkamp (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-12-11 | |||
22 | Valdet Rama (until 2011-02-25) | 1987-11-20 | |||
23 | Sofian Chahed (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-04-18 | |||
26 | Henrik Ernst (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-09-02 | |||
28 | Lars Stindl (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-08-26 | |||
30 | Carlitos (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-09-06 | |||
33 | Manuel Schmiedebach (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-12-05 | |||
34 | Konstantin Rausch (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-03-15 | |||
36 | Willi Evseev (until 2010-11-30) | 1992-02-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Mike Hanke (until 2010-12-31) | 1983-11-05 | |||
11 | Didier Ya Konan (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-05-22 | |||
13 | Jan Schlaudraff (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-07-18 | |||
25 | Mohammed Abdellaoue (from 2010-08-17) (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-10-23 | |||
32 | Mikael Forssell (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-03-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2010-08-14 19:30 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |