Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Christian Fiedler (until 2013-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Markus Babbel (until 2011-12-18) | 1972-09-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Rainer Widmayer (until 2011-12-18) | 1967-04-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Maikel Aerts (until 2012-06-30) | 1976-06-26 | |||
21 | Sascha Burchert (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-10-30 | |||
31 | Marco Sejna (until 2011-06-30) | 1972-03-20 | |||
34 | Richard Strebinger (from 2010-12-12) (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-02-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Christian Lell (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-08-29 | |||
4 | Roman Hubnik (until 2013-09-02) | 1984-06-06 | |||
5 | Andre Mijatovic (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | |||
6 | Christoph Janker (until 2015-01-30) | 1985-02-14 | |||
14 | Sebastian Neumann (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-02-18 | |||
22 | Kaka (until 2011-01-26) | 1981-05-16 | |||
24 | Shervin Radjabali-Fardi (until 2010-12-31) | 1991-05-17 | |||
27 | Alfredo Morales (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-05-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Lewan Kobiaschwili (until 2014-06-30) | 1977-07-10 | |||
7 | Daniel Beichler (from 2010-07-19) (until 2011-01-27) | 1988-10-13 | |||
8 | Pal Dardai (until 2011-06-30) | 1976-03-16 | |||
10 | Raffael (until 2012-07-26) | 1985-03-28 | |||
12 | Ronny (until 2016-08-31) | 1986-05-11 | |||
15 | Sascha Bigalke (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-01-08 | |||
18 | Peter Niemeyer (from 2010-08-09) (until 2015-08-03) | 1983-11-22 | |||
20 | Patrick Ebert (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-03-17 | |||
23 | Fanol Perdedaj (until 2012-09-02) | 1991-07-16 | |||
25 | Lennart Hartmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-04-03 | |||
26 | Nico Schulz (until 2015-08-18) | 1993-04-01 | |||
28 | Fabian Lustenberger (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-05-02 | |||
29 | Marvin Knoll (from 2010-12-05) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-12-05 | |||
30 | Andreas Neuendorf (from 2010-12-10) (until 2011-06-30) | 1975-02-09 | |||
44 | Gojko Kacar (until 2010-07-22) | 1987-01-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Adrian Ramos (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-01-22 | |||
13 | Nikita Rukavytsya (until 2012-08-30) | 1987-06-22 | |||
16 | Rob Friend (until 2011-08-30) | 1981-01-23 | |||
17 | Waleri Domowtschijski (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-10-05 | |||
19 | Pierre-Michel Lasogga (until 2013-09-01) | 1991-12-15 | |||
35 | Marco Djuricin (from 2010-08-19) (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-12-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2010-08-14 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2010-10-26 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |