Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Gadinger (until 2012-03-27) | 1956-07-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Scharinger (from 2011-03-02) (until 2011-10-30) | 1967-03-04 | ||||
Uwe Rapolder (from 2010-11-22) (until 2011-03-01) | 1958-05-29 | ||||
Markus Kauczinski (from 2010-11-01) (until 2010-11-21) | 1970-02-20 | ||||
Markus Schupp (until 2010-10-31) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Emig (until 2011-06-30) | 1962-06-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jean-Francois Kornetzky (until 2011-01-17) | 1982-07-28 | |||
29 | Kristian Nicht (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-04-03 | |||
32 | Luis Robles (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-05-11 | |||
37 | Mathias Moritz (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-02-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Matthias Zimmermann (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-06-16 | |||
3 | Stefan Muller (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-11-09 | |||
5 | Christian Demirtas (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-05-25 | |||
11 | Andreas Schafer (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-02-05 | |||
23 | Matthias Langkamp (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-02-24 | |||
24 | Sebastian Langkamp (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-01-15 | |||
28 | Thomas Konrad (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-11-05 | |||
33 | Thorben Stadler (from 2011-02-20) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-02-08 | |||
42 | Kiliann Witschi (from 2011-01-12) (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-11-09 | |||
45 | Martin Hudec (from 2011-01-31) (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-04-15 | |||
46 | Maximilian Mosch (from 2011-03-11) (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-04-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Godfried Aduobe (until 2011-06-30) | 1975-10-29 | |||
6 | Stefan Riess (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-12-09 | |||
8 | Michael Mutzel (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-09-27 | |||
10 | Massimilian Porcello (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-06-23 | |||
13 | Matthias Cuntz (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-05-04 | |||
17 | Timo Staffeldt (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-02-09 | |||
21 | Gaetan Krebs (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
22 | Marco Engelhardt (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-12-02 | |||
26 | Lukas Rupp (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-01-08 | |||
30 | Ole Schroder (from 2010-11-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-01-02 | |||
34 | Timo Kern (from 2010-09-24) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-01-16 | |||
38 | Patrick Haag (from 2010-11-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-03-09 | |||
43 | Pascal Gross (from 2011-01-28) (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-06-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Christian Timm (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-02-27 | |||
9 | Alexander Iaschwili (until 2012-06-30) | 1977-10-23 | |||
14 | Anton Fink (until 2011-01-30) | 1987-07-31 | |||
15 | Niklas Tarvajarvi (until 2011-02-28) | 1983-03-13 | |||
16 | Christopher Bieber (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-07-03 | |||
18 | Macauley Chrisantus (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-08-20 | |||
19 | Serhat Akin (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-06-05 | |||
20 | Simon Zoller (from 2010-11-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-06-26 | |||
27 | Patrick Dulleck (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-02-15 | |||
35 | Christopher Nguyen (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-01-13 | |||
36 | Andreas Voglsammer (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-01-09 | |||
39 | Delron Buckley (from 2011-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1977-12-07 | |||
40 | Andrei Cristea (from 2011-01-16) (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-05-15 | |||
41 | Denis Omerbegovic (from 2011-01-12) (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-03-11 | |||
44 | Marco Terrazzino (from 2011-01-28) (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-04-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2010-08-13 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |