Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Dirk Langerbein (until 2011-06-30) | 1971-09-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Arie van Lent (until 2011-06-30) | 1970-08-31 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Daniel Thioune (until 2011-06-30) | 1974-07-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Raphael Koczor (until 2010-12-31) | 1989-01-17 | ||||
1 | Andre Maczkowiak (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-04-01 | |||
24 | Alexander Hahnemann (from 2010-10-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-06-06 | |||
28 | Philipp Kuhn (from 2010-09-18) (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-03-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Marcel Busch (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-02-02 | |||
3 | David Vrzogic (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-08-10 | |||
4 | Cedric Mimbala (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-08-22 | |||
5 | Daniel Flottmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-08-06 | |||
13 | Philipp Stiller (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-05-20 | |||
22 | Christian Alder (until 2011-01-02) | 1978-09-03 | |||
27 | Erdal Celik (from 2011-01-31) (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-01-01 | |||
29 | Maximilian Dahlhoff (from 2010-10-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-11-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Robert Flessers (from 2011-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-02-11 | |||
7 | Marcus Piossek (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-07-21 | |||
10 | Nils-Ole Book (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-02-17 | |||
11 | Sebastian Ghasemi-Nobakht (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-10-11 | |||
14 | Janis Kraus (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-10-03 | |||
16 | Tim Manstein (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-09-25 | |||
17 | Rouven Meschede (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-01-20 | |||
19 | Bjorn Kluft (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-01-11 | |||
21 | David Blacha (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-10-22 | |||
23 | Kevin Wolk (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-05-28 | |||
31 | Pascal Schmidt (from 2010-10-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-01-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Matthew Taylor (from 2010-08-31) (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-10-17 | |||
9 | Manuel Eckel (from 2011-01-31) (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-12-13 | |||
9 | Christian Knappmann (until 2011-01-02) | 1981-03-19 | |||
12 | Bahattin Kose (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-08-26 | |||
18 | Sebastian Hille (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-10-19 | |||
25 | Cihan Ozkara (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-07-14 | |||
26 | Luka Tankulic (until 2010-12-31) | 1991-06-21 | |||
35 | Bertul Kocabas (until 2011-01-09) | 1992-02-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2010-08-14 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |