Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Uwe Bandermann (until 2011-06-30) | 1966-01-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dirk Helmig (until 2013-06-30) | 1965-05-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Carsten Schmitt (until 2012-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andre Bley (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-12-14 | |||
22 | Tobias Ritz (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-11-09 | |||
25 | Marcel Ptach (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-02-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Manuel Schulitz (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-09-04 | |||
5 | Niklas Schweer (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-07-17 | |||
12 | Stefan Hensel (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-11-25 | |||
14 | Felix Stahmer (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-12-06 | |||
15 | Heinrich Losing (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-02-25 | |||
16 | Ruben Nipken (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-03-26 | |||
21 | Thimo Sous (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-02-13 | |||
23 | Alexander Karachristos (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-04-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Tom Schikora (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-03-05 | |||
4 | Christopher Zeh (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-09-12 | |||
6 | Ozan Yilmaz (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-02-01 | |||
7 | Bjorn Grallert (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-08-29 | |||
8 | Kamil Bednarski (until 2012-12-31) | 1985-10-11 | |||
10 | Mark Zeh (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-11-19 | |||
13 | Dennis Hecht (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-01-16 | |||
18 | Mike Dzierzon (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-07-30 | |||
19 | Christos Pappas (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-05-26 | |||
20 | Pier Schulz (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-05-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Martin Setzke (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-08-10 | |||
11 | Dirk Heinzmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-10-20 | |||
19 | Sebastian Westerhoff (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-11-14 | |||
24 | Farschad Salehipour (until 2011-06-30) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2010-08-15 14:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |