Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Volker Lefebre (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-07-04 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Gunter Erhardt (until 2011-09-26) | 1960-11-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dmitri Papava (until 2011-06-30) | 1968-05-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Matthias Kuhn (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-05-12 | |||
12 | Marc Birkenbach (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-02-12 | |||
21 | Daniel Klas (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-09-07 | |||
36 | Tobias Rott (from 2011-04-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-01-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Matthias Kuhne (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-09-27 | |||
3 | Julian Weiersbach (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-04-30 | |||
4 | Thiemo Hohn (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-02-07 | |||
5 | Rene Schwall (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-04-28 | |||
6 | Nenad Simic (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-11-13 | |||
13 | Marc Gross (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-08-12 | |||
14 | Nikolaos Nakas (until 2010-08-30) | 1982-04-13 | |||
16 | Lukas Olbrich (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-08 | |||
17 | Adam Fall (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-04 | |||
24 | Nicolas Fernandes (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-01-07 | |||
25 | Emre Anuk (until 2010-12-31) | 1988-05-22 | |||
32 | Lukas Billick (from 2011-01-31) (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-02-09 | |||
34 | Andreas Backmann (until 2011-06-30) | 1976-06-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Thorsten Reiss (until 2014-01-30) | 1984-08-11 | |||
11 | Ajdin Zeric (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-04-12 | |||
14 | Christian Mikolajczak (from 2010-09-14) (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-05-15 | |||
19 | Max Englert (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-08-05 | |||
22 | Samir Kozarac (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-08-21 | |||
26 | Moussa Dansoko (from 2011-03-24) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-05-07 | |||
33 | Sebastian Wolf (from 2011-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-01-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Denis Omerbegovic (until 2011-01-11) | 1986-03-11 | |||
9 | Emre Gural (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-04-05 | |||
10 | Faysal El-Idrissi (until 2010-12-31) | 1977-11-16 | |||
15 | Zouhair Bouadoud (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-01-06 | |||
18 | Ali Moslehe (from 2011-01-31) (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-06-06 | |||
20 | Marcus Fischer (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-08-12 | |||
23 | Martin Willmann (until 2011-12-31) | 1979-11-01 | |||
27 | Aleksandre Karapetian (until 2011-12-31) | 1987-12-23 | |||
29 | Wilko Risser (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-08-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2010-08-14 19:30 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2010-10-27 20:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |