Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bert Ehm (until 2011-06-30) | 1946-10-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Roger Stilz (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-03-25 | ||||
Horst Kracht (until 2011-06-30) | 1930-03-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Florian Ludewig (until 2011-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | ||||
Dennis Wolf (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-02-05 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jan Lauer (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-02-02 | ||||
Jonah Asante (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-01-23 | ||||
Argetim Kaba (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-04-14 | ||||
Bum-Joon Kim (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-02-05 | ||||
Michael Meyer (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-09-12 | ||||
Tilman Patsalis (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-08-17 | ||||
Marcel Rutz (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-06-26 | ||||
Dennis Theissen (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-06-24 | ||||
Sascha Richert (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-09-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Roger Stilz (until 2012-06-30) | 1977-03-25 | ||||
Sven Trimborn (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-02-10 | ||||
Sergej Schulz (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-11-22 | ||||
Jan Vierig (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-06-24 | ||||
Andreas Bruck (from 2011-01-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-05-15 | ||||
Stephan Rahn (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-06-18 | ||||
Jasmin Bajramovic (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-09-23 | ||||
Mark Pomorin (until 2011-06-30) | 1976-11-07 | ||||
Ersin Cavus (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-10-19 | ||||
Yavuz Kement (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-05-12 | ||||
Jan Melich (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-10-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ahmet Hamurcu (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-10-02 | ||||
Benjamin Brameier (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-11-09 | ||||
Jan Geist (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-12-03 | ||||
Sascha Kremer (until 2011-06-30) | 1987-04-30 | ||||
Abdel Abou Khalil (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-06-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2010-08-15 14:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2010-10-26 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |