Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Adam Matysek (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-09-01 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Hecking (until 2012-12-21) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Armin Reutershahn (until 2013-10-07) | 1960-03-01 | ||||
Dirk Bremser (until 2012-12-21) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Raphael Schafer (until 2017-06-30) | 1979-01-30 | |||
22 | Patrick Rakovsky (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-06-02 | |||
30 | Alexander Stephan (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-09-15 | |||
32 | Benjamin Uphoff (from 2011-09-10) (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-08-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Per Nilsson (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-09-15 | |||
4 | Omar Gonzalez (from 2012-01-05) (until 2012-02-15) | 1988-10-11 | |||
6 | Dominic Maroh (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-03-04 | |||
15 | Timm Klose (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-05-09 | |||
21 | Marvin Plattenhardt (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-01-26 | |||
25 | Javier Pinola (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-02-24 | |||
26 | Timothy Chandler (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-03-29 | |||
38 | Philipp Wollscheid (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-03-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Timmy Simons (until 2013-06-30) | 1976-12-11 | |||
5 | Hanno Balitsch (from 2012-01-08) (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-01-02 | |||
7 | Markus Feulner (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-02-12 | |||
13 | Jens Hegeler (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
14 | Robert Mak (until 2014-07-19) | 1991-03-08 | |||
16 | Juri Judt (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-07-24 | |||
17 | Mike Frantz (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-10-14 | |||
18 | Almog Cohen (until 2013-02-03) | 1988-09-01 | |||
20 | Daniel Didavi (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-02-21 | |||
23 | Adam Hlousek (from 2012-01-03) (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-12-20 | |||
24 | Wilson Kamavuaka (until 2012-08-29) | 1990-03-29 | |||
28 | Manuel Zeitz (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-08-01 | |||
31 | Julian Wiessmeier (until 2012-08-28) | 1992-11-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Christian Eigler (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-01 | |||
9 | Tomas Pekhart (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-05-26 | |||
10 | Albert Bunjaku (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-11-29 | |||
29 | Rubin Okotie (until 2011-08-10) | 1987-06-06 | |||
33 | Alexander Esswein (until 2014-01-03) | 1990-03-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-30 15:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-10-26 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2011-12-20 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |