Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Igor Lazic (from 2011-09-06) (until 2011-12-05) | 1967-08-08 | ||||
Heiko Bonan (until 2011-08-29) | 1966-02-10 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Rene Gritschke (until 2011-12-05) | 1970-03-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Kevin Sommer (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-09-28 | ||||
1 | Daniel Rothe (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-02-25 | |||
12 | Nico Hinz (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-02-01 | |||
12 | Nico Hildebrandt (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-08-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ertan Turan (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-30 | ||||
2 | Markus Heitmann (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-07-12 | |||
2 | Alexander Rahmig (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-12-29 | |||
3 | Stefan Malchow (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-09-30 | |||
4 | Maciej Kwiatkowski (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-03-25 | |||
5 | Martin Neubert (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-10-30 | |||
13 | Stefan Krause (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-07-22 | |||
15 | Amadeus Wallschlager (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-09-01 | |||
20 | Nico Paepke (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-02-02 | |||
21 | Marcel Behnke (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-08-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Patrick Toepfer (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-10-20 | ||||
5 | Ozgur Ozvatan (until 2011-12-31) | 1985-03-03 | |||
6 | Sven Marten (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-10-23 | |||
7 | Kevin Gutsche (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-04-17 | |||
7 | Sebastian Beck (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
8 | Martin Lange (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-08-28 | |||
9 | Julian Wienbreyer (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-04-20 | |||
11 | Dennis Rehausen (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-06-04 | |||
16 | Norbert Lemcke (until 2011-12-31) | 1982-07-25 | |||
17 | Gokhan Ahmetcik (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-07-06 | |||
18 | David Schimmelpfennig (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-10-06 | |||
23 | Richard Steiner (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-10-01 | |||
25 | Philipp Werner (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-03-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ibrahima Sory Cisse (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-01-20 | ||||
10 | Matthias Steinborn (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-03-05 | |||
17 | Kevin-John Gutsche (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-04-17 | |||
19 | Shergo Biran (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-01-04 | |||
24 | Firat Karaduman (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-12-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-30 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |