Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Alexander Kunze (until 2015-06-30) | 1971-01-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Torsten Lieberknecht (until 2018-06-30) | 1973-08-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Darius Scholtysik (until 2015-06-30) | 1966-08-04 | ||||
Jurgen Rische (until 2015-06-30) | 1970-10-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marjan Petkovic (until 2015-06-30) | 1979-05-22 | |||
26 | Daniel Davari (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-06 | |||
30 | Benjamin Later (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-08-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Ermin Bicakcic (from 2012-01-08) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-01-24 | |||
4 | Matthias Henn (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-04-28 | |||
5 | Benjamin Kessel (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-10-01 | |||
8 | Deniz Dogan (until 2016-06-30) | 1979-10-20 | |||
14 | Jan Washausen (until 2013-01-17) | 1988-10-12 | |||
16 | Emre Turan (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-11-16 | |||
19 | Ken Reichel (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-12-19 | |||
23 | Julius Reinhardt (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-03-29 | |||
25 | Marcel Correia (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-05-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Damir Vrancic (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-10-04 | |||
7 | Benjamin Fuchs (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-10-20 | |||
10 | Mirko Boland (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-04-23 | |||
11 | Steffen Bohl (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-12-28 | |||
13 | Raffael Korte (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-08-29 | |||
15 | Norman Theuerkauf (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-01-24 | |||
17 | Markus Unger (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-11-18 | |||
18 | Oliver Petersch (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-04-26 | |||
20 | Nico Zimmermann (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-09-02 | |||
24 | Pascal Gos (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-08-15 | |||
27 | Gianluca Korte (until 2015-01-15) | 1990-08-29 | |||
27 | Oliver Kragl (until 2011-08-16) | 1990-05-12 | |||
31 | Marc Pfitzner (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-08-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Mathias Fetsch (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-09-30 | |||
12 | Domi Kumbela (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-04-20 | |||
21 | Pierre Merkel (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-05-25 | |||
22 | Randy Edwini-Bonsu (from 2012-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-04-20 | |||
32 | Dennis Kruppke (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-04-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2011-08-01 20:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |