Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Brano Arsenovic (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-07-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Tomas Oral (from 2011-11-10) (until 2013-06-30) | 1973-04-24 | ||||
Tomas Oral (from 2011-11-10) (until 2013-05-27) | 1973-04-24 | ||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 2011-11-09) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Sven Kmetsch (until 2011-11-09) | 1970-08-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Sascha Kirschstein (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-06-09 | |||
21 | Ramazan Ozcan (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-06-28 | |||
27 | Christopher Sommerer (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-03-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Andreas Schafer (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-02-05 | |||
4 | David Pisot (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-07-06 | |||
15 | Tobias Fink (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-12-11 | |||
18 | Moise Bambara (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-11-10 | |||
19 | Malte Metzelder (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-05-19 | |||
24 | Marc Hornschuh (from 2012-01-28) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-03-02 | |||
26 | Ralph Gunesch (from 2012-01-31) (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-09-02 | |||
32 | Ralf Keidel (from 2012-05-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1977-03-06 | |||
33 | Marino Biliskov (until 2013-06-30) | 1976-03-17 | |||
34 | Marvin Matip (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-09-25 | |||
37 | Andreas Gorlitz (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-01-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Manuel Hartmann (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-03-26 | |||
6 | Stefan Leitl (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | |||
7 | Christoph Knasmullner (from 2011-08-31) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-04-30 | |||
8 | Leonhard Haas (until 2012-08-24) | 1982-01-09 | |||
10 | Fabian Gerber (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-11-28 | |||
13 | Jose Ikeng (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-01-30 | |||
14 | Romain Dedola (until 2012-01-08) | 1989-01-02 | |||
16 | Andreas Buchner (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-05-15 | |||
20 | Kristoffer Andersen (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-12-09 | |||
30 | Florian Heller (from 2012-01-12) (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-03-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Moritz Hartmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-06-20 | |||
11 | Collin Quaner (from 2011-08-18) (until 2013-01-23) | 1991-06-18 | |||
14 | Adam Nemec (from 2012-01-27) (until 2012-07-24) | 1985-09-02 | |||
17 | Manuel Schaffler (from 2012-01-01) (until 2014-01-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
22 | Ahmed Akaichi (from 2011-08-01) (until 2013-01-09) | 1989-02-23 | |||
23 | Edson Buddle (until 2012-01-31) | 1981-05-21 | |||
31 | Caiuby (until 2014-07-10) | 1988-07-14 | |||
36 | Karl-Heinz Lappe (from 2011-11-18) (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-09-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2011-07-31 14:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-10-26 20:30 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |