Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Mousalli (until 2013-06-30) | 1972-08-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Oliver Freuen (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-09-21 | ||||
1 | Marco Behrens (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-12-26 | |||
31 | Christian Tokgozoglu (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-08-07 | |||
62 | Ercan Ates (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-01-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Hannes Wilking (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-04-17 | ||||
Vitor Rodrigues (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-02-06 | ||||
4 | Tobias Esche (until 2011-07-31) | 1991-02-03 | |||
6 | Dominic Krogemann (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-08-14 | |||
12 | Richard Baum (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-14 | |||
14 | Sedat Yucel (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-01-28 | |||
24 | Murat Salar (until 2012-06-30) | 1976-11-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Necati Uluisik (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-08 | |||
7 | Youness Buduar (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-03-13 | |||
10 | Mahmut Aktas (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-03-02 | |||
13 | Fabrizio Muzzicato (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-04-03 | |||
19 | Daniel Isailovic (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-07-12 | |||
20 | Yusuf Adewunmi (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-11-05 | |||
22 | Gokhan Aktas (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-02-16 | |||
27 | Serhan Zengin (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-04-11 | |||
28 | Benedetto Muzzicato (until 2012-06-30) | 1978-09-27 | |||
30 | Sebastian Hartung (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-12-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Soren Seidel (until 2012-12-31) | 1972-10-10 | |||
9 | Shaun Minns (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-03-11 | |||
18 | Omer Aktas (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-01-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2011-07-31 14:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |