Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Ronny Teuber (until 2014-06-30) | 1965-09-01 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thorsten Fink (from 2011-10-17) (until 2013-09-16) | 1967-10-29 | ||||
Frank Arnesen (from 2011-10-10) (until 2011-10-17) | 1956-09-30 | ||||
Rodolfo Cardoso (from 2011-09-19) (until 2011-10-09) | 1968-10-17 | ||||
Michael Oenning (until 2011-09-18) | 1965-09-27 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Patrick Rahmen (from 2011-10-17) (until 2013-09-16) | 1969-04-03 | ||||
Frank Heinemann (until 2013-06-30) | 1965-01-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jaroslav Drobny (until 2016-06-30) | 1979-10-18 | |||
29 | Tom Mickel (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-04-19 | |||
30 | Sven Neuhaus (from 2011-08-26) (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-04-04 | |||
30 | Wolfgang Hesl (until 2011-08-13) | 1986-01-13 | |||
40 | Florian Stritzel (from 2012-04-27) (until 2012-06-30) | 1994-01-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dennis Diekmeier (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-10-20 | |||
3 | Michael Mancienne (until 2014-07-16) | 1988-01-08 | |||
4 | Heiko Westermann (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-08-14 | |||
5 | Jeffrey Bruma (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-11-13 | |||
6 | Dennis Aogo (until 2013-08-28) | 1987-01-14 | |||
19 | Lennard Sowah (until 2012-01-30) | 1992-08-23 | |||
20 | Guy Demel (until 2011-08-30) | 1981-06-13 | |||
23 | Slobodan Rajkovic (from 2011-08-23) (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-02-03 | |||
26 | Robert Labus (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-10-10 | |||
32 | Florian Brugmann (from 2011-09-23) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-01-23 | |||
33 | Miroslav Stepanek (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-01-15 | |||
34 | Muhamed Besic (until 2012-08-31) | 1992-09-10 | |||
37 | Janek Sternberg (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-10-19 | |||
38 | Zhi Gin Lam (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-06-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Marcell Jansen (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-11-04 | |||
8 | Tomas Rincon (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-13 | |||
11 | Ivo Ilicevic (from 2011-08-31) (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-11-14 | |||
13 | Robert Tesche (until 2013-01-15) | 1987-05-27 | |||
14 | David Jarolim (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-05-17 | |||
17 | Gokhan Tore (until 2012-07-25) | 1992-01-20 | |||
18 | Romeo Castelen (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-05-03 | |||
22 | Jacopo Sala (until 2013-07-23) | 1991-12-05 | |||
25 | Per Skjelbred (from 2011-08-04) (until 2013-09-01) | 1987-06-16 | |||
27 | Soren Bertram (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-06-05 | |||
28 | Tolgay Arslan (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-08-16 | |||
31 | Daniel Nagy (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-03-15 | |||
32 | Anis Ben-Hatira (until 2011-08-30) | 1988-07-18 | |||
35 | Hanno Behrens (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-03-26 | |||
36 | Kevin Ingreso (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-02-10 | |||
42 | Mickael Tavares (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-10-25 | |||
44 | Gojko Kacar (until 2014-02-13) | 1987-01-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Paolo Guerrero (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-01 | |||
10 | Mladen Petric (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | |||
11 | Eljero Elia (until 2011-08-29) | 1987-02-13 | |||
15 | Heung-Min Son (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-07-08 | |||
16 | Marcus Berg (until 2013-07-07) | 1986-08-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-30 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2011-10-25 20:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-12-21 20:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |