Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Alexander Ogrinc (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-12-10 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Wolf (from 2011-12-07) (until 2012-09-03) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Peter Vollmann (until 2011-12-06) | 1957-12-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Hartmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1974-07-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jorg Hahnel (until 2015-01-21) | 1982-01-11 | |||
19 | Kevin Muller (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-03-15 | |||
35 | Johannes Brinkies (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-06-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Pavel Kostal (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-09-17 | |||
3 | Matthias Holst (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-06-19 | |||
4 | Robert Muller (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-11-12 | |||
13 | Stephan Gusche (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-13 | |||
16 | Dexter Langen (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-12-16 | |||
20 | Peter Schyrba (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-10-17 | |||
22 | Marek Janecka (from 2012-01-19) (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-06-09 | |||
25 | Sebastian Pelzer (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-09-24 | |||
26 | Tommy Grupe (from 2012-04-05) (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-03-29 | |||
30 | Pelle Jensen (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-05-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Dominic Peitz (from 2011-08-31) (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-09-11 | |||
5 | Sergej Evljuskin (until 2011-08-23) | 1988-01-04 | |||
6 | Michael Wiemann (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-02-09 | |||
7 | Mohammed Lartey (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-12-04 | |||
8 | Kevin Pannewitz (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-10-16 | |||
11 | Marek Mintal (until 2012-06-30) | 1977-09-02 | |||
14 | Tom Weilandt (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-04-27 | |||
15 | Manfred Starke (from 2011-11-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-02-21 | |||
17 | Timo Perthel (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-02-11 | |||
21 | Michael Blum (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-12-25 | |||
24 | Edisson Jordanov (from 2012-02-05) (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-06-08 | |||
27 | Bjorn Ziegenbein (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-04-30 | |||
29 | Tobias Janicke (until 2012-08-29) | 1989-03-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Lucas Albrecht (until 2012-12-31) | 1991-01-09 | |||
10 | Radovan Vujanovic (until 2011-08-28) | 1982-02-18 | |||
23 | Freddy Borg (from 2012-01-22) (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-11-27 | |||
28 | Marcel Schied (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-07-28 | |||
33 | Tino Semmer (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-09-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-30 19:30 |
3 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |