Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Waldemar Wrobel (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-01-02 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Dier (until 2012-06-30) | 1966-09-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dennis Lamczyk (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-02-15 | |||
22 | Philipp Kunz (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-02-21 | |||
23 | Robert Moewes (from 2012-01-01) (until 2012-08-23) | 1993-02-27 | |||
23 | Moritz Niebuhr (until 2011-12-31) | 1990-12-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Kevin Lehmann (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-05-22 | |||
4 | Dirk Jasmund (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-05-30 | |||
5 | Sebastian Jansen (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-11-10 | |||
11 | Vincent Wagner (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-04-05 | |||
14 | Maik Rodenberg (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-01-29 | |||
15 | Adrian Schneider (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-10-25 | |||
16 | Roberto Guirino (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-01-22 | |||
25 | Julian Dusy (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-03-12 | |||
26 | Thomas Denker (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-01-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Holger Lemke (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-07-22 | |||
6 | Timo Brauer (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-05-30 | |||
7 | Kerim Avci (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-12-16 | |||
8 | Stefan Grummel (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-09 | |||
10 | Suat Tokat (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-05-02 | |||
13 | Kevin Grund (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-08-14 | |||
17 | Cedric Vennemann (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-03-16 | |||
18 | Markus Heppke (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-04-11 | |||
24 | Maik Kuta (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-07-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Gungor Kaya (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-04-27 | |||
19 | Leon Enzmann (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-10-28 | |||
21 | Lukas Lenz (until 2013-01-15) | 1989-01-18 | |||
27 | Marcel Schlomm (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-01-03 | |||
30 | Benedikt Koep (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-10-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2011-07-29 20:30 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-10-26 19:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |