Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Michael Gibhardt (until 2012-06-30) | 1958-05-18 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Peter Kunkel (from 2011-10-05) (until 2014-06-30) | 1956-02-10 | ||||
Mario Basler (from 2011-10-24) (until 2012-09-14) | 1968-12-18 | ||||
Theo Schneider (until 2011-10-04) | 1960-08-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Oliver Adler (until 2012-06-30) | 1967-10-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Melka (until 2012-06-30) | 1978-07-09 | |||
22 | Niklas Hartmann (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-12-09 | |||
33 | Thorben Krol (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-05-20 | |||
35 | Semih Demirhat (from 2011-11-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-03-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Benjamin Weigelt (from 2011-12-16) (until 2017-06-30) | 1982-09-04 | |||
4 | Dimitrios Pappas (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-02-25 | |||
8 | Benjamin Reichert (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-05-17 | |||
14 | Esad Razic (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-07-27 | |||
17 | Kevin Corvers (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-08-17 | |||
18 | Jeff Gyasi (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-01-04 | |||
23 | Felix Schiller (until 2012-08-29) | 1989-12-06 | |||
24 | Tobias Willers (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-04-21 | |||
26 | Felicio Brown Forbes (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-08-28 | |||
31 | Dominik Borutzki (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-06-07 | |||
36 | Kevin Kolberg (from 2012-03-24) (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-11-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Yohannes Bahcecioglu (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-02-26 | |||
6 | Mario Klinger (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-12-27 | |||
7 | Nedim Hasanbegovic (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-04-22 | |||
13 | Marvin Grumann (from 2011-08-26) (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-06-23 | |||
15 | Danijel Gataric (until 2012-06-30) | 1986-05-18 | |||
20 | Florian Abel (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-08-14 | |||
21 | Timo Kunert (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-03-12 | |||
30 | Serkan Gocer (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-06-26 | |||
39 | Alexander Scheelen (from 2011-10-13) (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-06-25 | |||
40 | Kevin Steuke (from 2011-10-13) (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-11-23 | |||
44 | Anel Dzaka (from 2012-01-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-09-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Christopher Kullmann (until 2012-01-30) | 1986-09-19 | |||
10 | Mike Terranova (until 2013-06-30) | 1976-11-17 | |||
11 | Fatih Duran (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-02-28 | |||
16 | Jannis Schliesing (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-01-05 | |||
19 | Marvin Ellmann (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-09-21 | |||
25 | Junior Torunarigha (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-04-18 | |||
29 | David Jansen (from 2012-01-20) (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-12-04 | |||
32 | Fatih Candan (from 2011-10-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-12-30 | |||
38 | Kevin Menke (from 2012-03-31) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-09-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-30 19:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |