Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Kronenberg (until 2022-06-30) | 1974-09-10 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Christian Streich (from 2011-12-30) (until 2024-06-30) | 1965-06-11 | ||||
Marcus Sorg (until 2011-12-29) | 1965-12-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Lars Vossler (from 2011-12-29) (until 2024-06-30) | 1976-03-09 | ||||
Patrick Baier (until 2014-06-30) | 1967-12-24 | ||||
Christian Streich (until 2011-12-29) | 1965-06-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Baumann (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-06-02 | |||
19 | Daniel Batz (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-01-12 | |||
21 | Manuel Salz (until 2011-12-31) | 1985-08-06 | |||
36 | Alexander Schwolow (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-06-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Pavel Krmas (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-03-03 | |||
3 | Felix Bastians (until 2012-01-25) | 1988-05-09 | |||
4 | Beg Ferati (until 2013-01-30) | 1986-11-10 | |||
5 | Heiko Butscher (until 2012-01-10) | 1980-07-28 | |||
13 | Fallou Diagne (from 2012-01-06) (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-08-14 | |||
15 | Oliver Barth (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-10-06 | |||
16 | Michael Lumb (from 2012-01-16) (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-01-09 | |||
20 | Andreas Hinkel (from 2011-10-06) (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-03-26 | |||
24 | Mensur Mujdza (until 2016-08-28) | 1984-03-28 | |||
25 | Oliver Sorg (from 2012-01-21) (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-05-29 | |||
28 | Matthias Ginter (from 2012-01-21) (until 2014-07-16) | 1994-01-19 | |||
28 | Daniel Williams (until 2011-08-30) | 1989-03-08 | |||
41 | Immanuel Hohn (from 2011-08-13) (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-12-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Yacine Abdessadki (until 2011-12-20) | 1981-01-01 | |||
7 | Cedric Makiadi (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-02-23 | |||
8 | Jan Rosenthal (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-04-07 | |||
10 | Maximilian Nicu (until 2012-01-30) | 1982-11-25 | |||
14 | Anton Putsila (until 2013-02-17) | 1987-06-10 | |||
17 | Jonathan Schmid (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-06-26 | |||
18 | Johannes Flum (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-12-14 | |||
20 | Ivica Banovic (until 2011-08-02) | 1980-08-02 | |||
23 | Julian Schuster (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-04-15 | |||
29 | Christian Bickel (until 2012-01-30) | 1991-01-27 | |||
31 | Karim Guede (from 2012-01-18) (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-01-07 | |||
40 | Daniel Caligiuri (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-01-15 | |||
44 | Marc Lais (from 2012-04-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-02-04 | |||
48 | Erich Sautner (from 2012-04-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-11-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Ivan Santini (from 2012-01-31) (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-05-21 | |||
9 | Papiss Demba Cisse (until 2012-01-16) | 1985-06-03 | |||
11 | Garra Dembele (until 2013-01-30) | 1986-02-21 | |||
22 | Kisho Yano (until 2012-02-07) | 1984-04-05 | |||
26 | Erik Jendrisek (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-10-26 | |||
27 | Stefan Reisinger (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-09-14 | |||
33 | Simon Brandstetter (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-05-02 | |||
35 | Sebastian Freis (from 2012-01-17) (until 2015-01-10) | 1985-04-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2011-07-31 14:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |