Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Menger (until 2014-06-30) | 1972-09-11 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Bruno Labbadia (until 2013-08-25) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Eddy Sozer (until 2013-08-25) | 1968-07-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Sven Ulreich (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-08-03 | |||
22 | Marc Ziegler (until 2013-06-30) | 1976-06-13 | |||
30 | Bernd Leno (until 2011-08-09) | 1992-03-04 | |||
35 | Andre Weis (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Gotoku Sakai (from 2012-01-02) (until 2015-07-06) | 1991-03-14 | |||
3 | Cristian Molinaro (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-07-30 | |||
5 | Serdar Tasci (until 2013-08-29) | 1987-04-24 | |||
6 | Georg Niedermeier (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-02-26 | |||
14 | Francisco Rodriguez (until 2013-01-02) | 1981-10-20 | |||
15 | Arthur Boka (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-04-02 | |||
17 | Matthieu Delpierre (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-04-26 | |||
21 | Khalid Boulahrouz (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-12-28 | |||
27 | Stefano Celozzi (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-11-02 | |||
30 | Antonio Rudiger (from 2011-12-17) (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-03-03 | |||
32 | Steffen Lang (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-08-14 | |||
34 | Patrick Bauer (until 2012-08-16) | 1992-10-28 | |||
38 | Ermin Bicakcic (until 2012-01-07) | 1990-01-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | William Kvist (until 2014-08-31) | 1985-02-24 | |||
8 | Zdravko Kuzmanovic (until 2013-01-30) | 1987-09-22 | |||
11 | Johan Audel (until 2013-09-01) | 1983-12-12 | |||
13 | Timo Gebhart (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-04-12 | |||
16 | Ibrahima Traore (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-04-21 | |||
20 | Christian Gentner (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-08-14 | |||
24 | Mamadou Bah (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-04-25 | |||
25 | Tobias Rathgeb (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-05-03 | |||
26 | Raphael Holzhauser (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-02-16 | |||
28 | Tamas Hajnal (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-03-15 | |||
35 | Christian Trasch (until 2011-07-24) | 1987-09-01 | |||
40 | Kevin Stoger (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-08-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Martin Harnik (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-06-10 | |||
9 | Vedad Ibisevic (from 2012-01-25) (until 2015-08-30) | 1984-08-06 | |||
18 | Cacau (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-03-27 | |||
23 | Julian Schieber (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-02-13 | |||
29 | Pawel Pogrebnjak (until 2012-01-30) | 1983-11-08 | |||
31 | Shinji Okazaki (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-04-16 | |||
33 | Pascal Breier (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-02-02 | |||
36 | Christoph Hemlein (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-12-16 | |||
37 | Alexander Riemann (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-04-12 | |||
39 | Alexander Aschauer (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-03-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2011-07-29 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-10-26 20:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2011-12-21 20:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-02-08 20:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |