Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Greiber (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-10-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Andreas Bergmann (from 2011-09-15) (until 2012-10-27) | 1959-06-18 | ||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 2011-09-14) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Thomas Reis (from 2012-02-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1973-10-04 | ||||
Karsten Neitzel (from 2011-09-15) (until 2012-10-28) | 1967-12-17 | ||||
Christoph John (until 2011-09-14) | 1958-12-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andreas Luthe (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-03-10 | |||
29 | Markus Scholz (from 2012-05-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-05-17 | |||
29 | Philipp Heerwagen (until 2012-01-13) | 1983-04-13 | |||
31 | Michael Esser (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-11-22 | |||
34 | Jonas Ermes (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-04-02 | |||
37 | Felix Dornebusch (from 2012-02-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1994-07-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Bjorn Kopplin (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-01-07 | |||
4 | Marcel Maltritz (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-10-02 | |||
6 | Lukas Sinkiewicz (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-10-09 | |||
15 | Holmar Eyjolfsson (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-08-06 | |||
19 | Patrick Fabian (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-10-11 | |||
19 | Matthias Ostrzolek (until 2012-01-28) | 1990-06-05 | |||
24 | Philipp Bonig (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-03-20 | |||
25 | Anthar Yahia (until 2011-07-16) | 1982-03-21 | |||
26 | Jonas Acquistapace (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-06-18 | |||
28 | Matias Concha (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-03-31 | |||
35 | Jannik Stevens (from 2012-04-13) (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-07-21 | |||
36 | Christian Mengert (from 2012-03-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-02-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Christoph Dabrowski (until 2013-06-30) | 1978-07-01 | |||
7 | Paul Freier (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-07-26 | |||
8 | Andreas Johansson (until 2012-01-19) | 1982-03-10 | |||
10 | Mimoun Azaouagh (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-11-17 | |||
11 | Takashi Inui (from 2011-08-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-06-02 | |||
14 | Denis Berger (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-04-14 | |||
16 | Kevin Vogt (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-09-23 | |||
17 | Oguzhan Kefkir (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-08-27 | |||
18 | Giovanni Federico (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-10-04 | |||
20 | Faton Toski (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-02-17 | |||
23 | Christoph Kramer (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-02-19 | |||
25 | Michael Delura (from 2012-01-31) (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-07-01 | |||
32 | Enes Uzun (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-01-25 | |||
33 | Philip Semlits (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-11-09 | |||
39 | Onur Bulut (from 2012-05-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1994-04-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Nikolos Gelaschwili (from 2012-01-30) (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-08-05 | |||
9 | Tae-Se Jong (until 2012-01-29) | 1984-03-02 | |||
19 | Kevin Freiberger (from 2012-03-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-11-16 | |||
21 | Daniel Ginczek (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-04-13 | |||
22 | Mirkan Aydin (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-07-08 | |||
27 | Zlatko Dedic (until 2011-08-30) | 1984-10-05 | |||
30 | Hans Kyei (from 2012-04-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-08-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-30 19:30 |
3 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2011-10-25 19:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2011-12-20 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |