Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Michael Kraft (until 2013-05-24) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 2013-05-14) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Mathias Honerbach (until 2013-05-24) | 1962-04-13 | ||||
Wolfgang Rolff (until 2013-05-14) | 1959-12-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tim Wiese (until 2012-06-30) | 1981-12-17 | |||
21 | Sebastian Mielitz (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-07-18 | |||
33 | Christian Vander (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-10-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Sebastian Boenisch (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-02-01 | |||
3 | Francois Affolter (from 2012-01-25) (until 2012-12-31) | 1991-03-13 | |||
4 | Naldo (until 2012-07-18) | 1982-09-10 | |||
8 | Clemens Fritz (until 2017-06-30) | 1980-12-07 | |||
13 | Lukas Schmitz (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-10-13 | |||
15 | Sebastian Prodl (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-06-21 | |||
16 | Mikael Silvestre (until 2012-06-30) | 1977-08-09 | |||
22 | Sokratis (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-06-09 | |||
23 | Andreas Wolf (until 2012-01-22) | 1982-06-12 | |||
26 | Florian Hartherz (from 2011-08-31) (until 2013-09-01) | 1993-05-29 | |||
29 | Per Mertesacker (until 2011-08-30) | 1984-09-29 | |||
37 | Leon Balogun (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-06-28 | |||
38 | Clemens Schoppenhauer (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-02-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Wesley (until 2012-03-07) | 1987-06-24 | |||
6 | Tim Borowski (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-05-02 | |||
10 | Marko Marin (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-03-13 | |||
14 | Aaron Hunt (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-09-04 | |||
17 | Aleksandar Ignjovski (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-01-27 | |||
18 | Felix Kroos (until 2016-01-28) | 1991-03-12 | |||
20 | Mehmet Ekici (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-03-25 | |||
23 | Zlatko Junuzovic (from 2012-01-30) (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-09-26 | |||
25 | Tom Trybull (until 2014-01-02) | 1993-03-09 | |||
28 | Kevin Schindler (until 2011-08-16) | 1988-05-21 | |||
31 | Predrag Stevanovic (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-03-03 | |||
32 | Ozkan Yildirim (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-04-10 | |||
34 | Aleksandar Stevanovic (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-02-16 | |||
35 | Florian Trinks (until 2013-01-30) | 1992-03-11 | |||
44 | Philipp Bargfrede (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-03-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Marko Arnautovic (until 2013-09-01) | 1989-04-19 | |||
9 | Denni Avdic (until 2012-08-28) | 1988-09-05 | |||
11 | Markus Rosenberg (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-09-27 | |||
19 | Sandro Wagner (until 2012-01-17) | 1987-11-29 | |||
24 | Claudio Pizarro (until 2012-06-30) | 1978-10-03 | |||
30 | Marko Futacs (until 2011-08-25) | 1990-02-22 | |||
36 | Lennart Thy (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-02-25 | |||
41 | Niclas Fullkrug (from 2012-01-01) (until 2013-08-23) | 1993-02-09 | |||
46 | Onur Ayik (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-01-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-30 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |