Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Gerry Ehrmann (until 2015-06-30) | 1959-02-18 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Franco Foda (until 2013-08-29) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Sulzmann (from 2012-09-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-08-06 | ||||
Thomas Kristl (until 2013-08-29) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tobias Sippel (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-03-22 | |||
22 | David Hohs (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-03-16 | |||
32 | Marius Muller (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-07-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Leon Jessen (until 2013-01-30) | 1986-06-11 | ||||
2 | Jan Simunek (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-02-20 | |||
6 | Mathias Abel (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-06-22 | |||
13 | Florian Riedel (from 2012-08-31) (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-04-09 | |||
14 | Enis Hajri (until 2013-07-21) | 1983-03-06 | |||
15 | Marc Torrejon (from 2012-08-26) (until 2014-08-26) | 1986-02-18 | |||
17 | Alexander Bugera (until 2013-06-30) | 1978-08-08 | |||
20 | Rodnei (until 2012-08-30) | 1985-09-11 | |||
23 | Florian Dick (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-11-09 | |||
25 | Anthar Yahia (until 2013-01-13) | 1982-03-21 | |||
31 | Chris Lowe (from 2013-01-12) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-04-16 | |||
33 | Dominique Heintz (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-08-15 | |||
34 | Willi Orban (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-11-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus Karl (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-02-14 | ||||
4 | Ariel Borysiuk (until 2014-01-30) | 1991-07-29 | |||
5 | Enis Alushi (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-12-22 | |||
7 | Mimoun Azaouagh (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-11-17 | |||
8 | Christian Tiffert (until 2012-07-26) | 1982-02-18 | |||
9 | Alexander Baumjohann (from 2012-08-21) (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-01-23 | |||
18 | Chadli Amri (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-12-14 | |||
19 | Denis Linsmayer (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-09-19 | |||
20 | Mitchell Weiser (from 2013-01-03) (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-04-21 | |||
21 | Pierre De Wit (until 2013-08-04) | 1987-09-26 | |||
24 | Gil Vermouth (until 2012-09-02) | 1985-08-05 | |||
25 | Benjamin Kohler (from 2013-01-18) (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-08-04 | |||
26 | Steven Zellner (until 2015-02-01) | 1991-03-14 | |||
27 | Mario Pokar (from 2012-10-26) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-18 | |||
28 | Kostas Fortounis (until 2014-07-20) | 1992-10-16 | |||
30 | Christopher Drazan (from 2013-01-11) (until 2014-08-26) | 1990-10-02 | |||
39 | Hendrick Zuck (until 2013-01-30) | 1990-07-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Mohamadou Idrissou (from 2012-07-27) (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-03-08 | |||
9 | Itay Shechter (until 2012-08-14) | 1987-02-22 | |||
10 | Albert Bunjaku (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-11-29 | |||
11 | Erwin Hoffer (from 2013-01-30) (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-04-14 | |||
11 | Ilijan Mizanski (until 2013-01-30) | 1985-12-20 | |||
24 | Sascha Wolfert (from 2012-10-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-26 | |||
29 | Kwame Nsor (until 2013-08-28) | 1992-08-01 | |||
31 | Jakub Swierczok (until 2012-07-22) | 1992-12-28 | |||
35 | Julian Derstroff (until 2013-07-18) | 1992-01-05 | |||
37 | Andrew Wooten (until 2012-08-22) | 1989-09-30 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Leon Jessen (from 2013-01-30) (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-06-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-19 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-10-31 20:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |