Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Heinz Bohmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1962-06-14 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Luginger (until 2013-09-05) | 1967-12-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Andreas Fellhauer (until 2014-06-30) | 1971-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Enver Marina (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-01-27 | |||
20 | Michael Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-08-16 | |||
23 | Benedikt Fernandez (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-01-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Adam Straith (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-09-11 | |||
3 | Lukas Kohler (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-05-24 | |||
4 | Kai Gehring (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-02-12 | |||
5 | Pascal Pellowski (until 2013-11-15) | 1988-12-18 | |||
16 | Frederic Ehrmann (from 2013-02-09) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-08-05 | |||
17 | Tim Knipping (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-11-24 | |||
18 | Nicolas Jullich (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-03-27 | |||
19 | Marc Lerandy (until 2013-11-17) | 1981-11-25 | |||
33 | Arthur Schneider (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-05-01 | |||
36 | Tim Stegerer (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-07-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Kevin Maek (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-11-04 | |||
6 | Christian Eggert (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-01-16 | |||
7 | Sven Sokler (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-11-09 | |||
8 | Tim Kruse (until 2014-01-16) | 1983-01-10 | |||
10 | Marius Laux (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-02-07 | |||
11 | Markus Hayer (until 2014-01-30) | 1985-08-18 | |||
13 | Ufuk Ozbek (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-09-01 | |||
14 | Serkan Gocer (until 2014-01-20) | 1993-06-26 | |||
15 | Markus Pazurek (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-12-18 | |||
21 | Yannick Bach (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-05-21 | |||
22 | Manuel Stiefler (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-07-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Kiyan Soltanpour (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-07-23 | |||
11 | Markus Fuchs (until 2012-07-17) | 1980-02-24 | |||
24 | Jaron Schafer (from 2013-02-03) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-14 | |||
27 | Felix Dausend (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-11-01 | |||
29 | Marcel Sokler (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-03-26 | |||
31 | Michael Petry (from 2013-03-01) (until 2013-04-30) | 1976-08-31 | |||
38 | Marcel Ziemer (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-08-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-19 16:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |