Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Holger Bahra (until 2014-06-30) | 1958-03-20 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Neuhaus (until 2014-06-30) | 1959-11-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Andre Hofschneider (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-06-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Haas (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-08-01 | |||
20 | Jan Glinker (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-01-18 | |||
21 | Sebastian Patzler (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-10-24 | |||
28 | Kilian Pruschke (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-09-08 | |||
40 | Marcel Hottecke (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-04-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Roberto Puncec (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-10-27 | |||
5 | Christian Stuff (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-08-11 | |||
6 | Marc Pfertzel (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-05-21 | |||
7 | Patrick Kohlmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-02-25 | |||
13 | Bjorn Kopplin (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-01-07 | |||
15 | Daniel Gohlert (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-09-25 | |||
16 | Christoph Menz (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-12-22 | |||
18 | Maurice Trapp (until 2013-01-13) | 1991-12-31 | |||
26 | Niklas Wiebach (from 2013-02-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-11-30 | |||
29 | Michael Parensen (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-06-24 | |||
34 | Fabian Schonheim (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-02-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Christopher Quiring (until 2017-01-13) | 1990-11-23 | |||
8 | Baris Ozbek (from 2013-01-25) (until 2015-01-10) | 1986-09-14 | |||
8 | Markus Karl (until 2013-01-23) | 1986-02-14 | |||
9 | Felipe Gallegos (from 2012-08-03) (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-12-03 | |||
12 | Oliver Hofmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-08-19 | |||
14 | Patrick Zoundi (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-07-19 | |||
17 | Torsten Mattuschka (until 2014-08-30) | 1980-10-04 | |||
21 | Tijani Belaid (until 2013-01-17) | 1987-09-06 | |||
25 | Bjorn Jopek (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-08-24 | |||
27 | Eroll Zejnullahu (from 2013-02-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-10-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Simon Terodde (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-03-02 | |||
19 | Chinedu Ede (until 2012-07-22) | 1987-02-05 | |||
23 | Silvio (until 2014-01-27) | 1985-02-01 | |||
24 | Steven Skrzybski (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-11-18 | |||
32 | Adam Nemec (from 2012-07-25) (until 2015-01-25) | 1985-09-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2012-08-20 18:30 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-10-31 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |