Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
David Thiel (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-07-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Sascha Lewandowski (until 2013-06-30) | 1971-10-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jan-Moritz Lichte (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-01-12 | ||||
Sami Hyypia (until 2013-06-30) | 1973-10-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bernd Leno (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-03-04 | |||
22 | David Yelldell (until 2016-06-30) | 1981-10-01 | |||
33 | Michael Rensing (from 2012-08-29) (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
36 | Niklas Lomb (until 2015-01-07) | 1993-07-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Daniel Schwaab (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-08-23 | |||
4 | Philipp Wollscheid (until 2014-09-01) | 1989-03-06 | |||
5 | Manuel Friedrich (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-09-13 | |||
17 | Sebastian Boenisch (from 2012-11-04) (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-02-01 | |||
20 | Dani Carvajal (from 2012-07-11) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-01-11 | |||
21 | Omer Toprak (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-07-21 | |||
23 | Carlinhos (until 2013-01-14) | 1994-06-22 | |||
24 | Michal Kadlec (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-12-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christoph Kramer (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-02-19 | ||||
3 | Stefan Reinartz (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-01-01 | |||
6 | Simon Rolfes (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-01-21 | |||
8 | Lars Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
10 | Renato Augusto (until 2012-12-31) | 1988-02-08 | |||
13 | Jens Hegeler (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
14 | Hajime Hosogai (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-06-10 | |||
18 | Sidney Sam (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-31 | |||
27 | Gonzalo Castro (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-06-11 | |||
28 | Erik Zenga (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
29 | Luca Durholtz (from 2012-11-22) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-08-18 | |||
30 | Kolja Pusch (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-02-12 | |||
31 | Dominik Kohr (until 2014-01-12) | 1994-01-31 | |||
32 | Jonas Meffert (from 2012-11-22) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-09-04 | |||
38 | Karim Bellarabi (until 2013-08-20) | 1990-04-08 | |||
40 | Julian Riedel (from 2012-12-06) (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-08-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Antenor Junior Fernandes (from 2012-07-06) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-10-04 | |||
9 | Andre Schurrle (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-11-06 | |||
11 | Stefan Kiessling (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-01-25 | |||
16 | Arkadiusz Milik (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-08-30) | 1994-02-28 | |||
19 | Okan Aydin (from 2012-10-20) (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-05-08 | |||
19 | Samed Yesil (until 2012-08-29) | 1994-05-25 | |||
37 | Tobias Steffen (from 2012-11-22) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-06-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2012-08-18 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-10-31 19:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-12-19 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |