Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Klopp (until 2015-06-30) | 1967-06-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Zeljko Buvac (until 2015-06-30) | 1961-09-13 | ||||
Peter Krawietz (until 2015-06-30) | 1972-05-07 | ||||
Dr. Andreas Schlumberger (until 2013-06-30) | 1966-07-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Roman Weidenfeller (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
20 | Mitchell Langerak (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-08-22 | |||
33 | Zlatan Alomerovic (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-06-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Marc Hornschuh (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-03-02 | |||
4 | Neven Subotic (until 2017-01-25) | 1988-12-10 | |||
15 | Mats Hummels (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-12-16 | |||
22 | Patrick Owomoyela (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-11-05 | |||
24 | Chris Lowe (until 2013-01-11) | 1989-04-16 | |||
25 | Thomas Meissner (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-03-26 | |||
26 | Lukasz Piszczek (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-06-03 | |||
27 | Felipe Santana (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-03-17 | |||
29 | Marcel Schmelzer (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
30 | Koray Gunter (until 2014-01-29) | 1994-08-16 | |||
37 | Marcel Halstenberg (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-09-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Sebastian Kehl (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-02-13 | |||
6 | Sven Bender (until 2017-07-13) | 1989-04-27 | |||
7 | Moritz Leitner (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-12-08 | |||
8 | Ilkay Gundogan (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-10-24 | |||
10 | Mario Gotze (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-06-03 | |||
14 | Ivan Perisic (until 2013-01-05) | 1989-02-02 | |||
16 | Jakub Blaszczykowski (until 2015-08-31) | 1985-12-14 | |||
18 | Nuri Sahin (from 2013-01-11) (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-09-05 | |||
19 | Kevin Grosskreutz (until 2015-09-02) | 1988-07-19 | |||
21 | Oliver Kirch (until 2015-08-30) | 1982-08-21 | |||
28 | Mustafa Amini (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-04-20 | |||
31 | Marvin Bakalorz (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-09-13 | |||
32 | Leonardo Bittencourt (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-12-19 | |||
35 | Jonas Hofmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-07-14 | |||
36 | Rico Benatelli (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-03-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Robert Lewandowski (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-08-21 | |||
11 | Marco Reus (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-05-31 | |||
23 | Julian Schieber (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-02-13 | |||
34 | Marvin Ducksch (until 2014-07-01) | 1994-03-07 | |||
38 | Balint Bajner (from 2013-02-16) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-11-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2012-08-18 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-10-30 20:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-12-19 20:30 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-02-27 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |