Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Manfred Petz (until 2014-06-30) | 1961-05-05 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Armin Veh (until 2014-06-30) | 1961-02-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Reiner Geyer (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-04-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oka Nikolov (until 2013-06-30) | 1974-05-25 | |||
1 | Kevin Trapp (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-07-08 | |||
32 | Aykut Ozer (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-01-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Carlos Zambrano (from 2012-08-17) (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-07-10 | |||
3 | Heiko Butscher (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-07-28 | |||
4 | Marco Russ (from 2013-01-04) (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-08-04 | |||
4 | Vadim Demidov (from 2012-07-23) (until 2012-12-31) | 1986-10-10 | |||
5 | Martin Amedick (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-09-06 | |||
6 | Bastian Oczipka (until 2017-07-14) | 1989-01-12 | |||
15 | Constant Djakpa (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-10-17 | |||
22 | Stefano Celozzi (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-11-02 | |||
23 | Bamba Anderson (from 2012-08-01) (until 2017-04-26) | 1988-01-10 | |||
24 | Sebastian Jung (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-06-22 | |||
34 | Erik Wille (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-03-28 | |||
36 | Marc-Oliver Kempf (until 2014-07-14) | 1995-01-28 | |||
38 | Giorgios Tzavellas (until 2012-08-06) | 1987-11-26 | |||
39 | Julian Dudda (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-04-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Benjamin Kohler (until 2013-01-17) | 1980-08-04 | |||
8 | Takashi Inui (until 2015-08-26) | 1988-06-02 | |||
13 | Martin Lanig (until 2015-01-23) | 1984-07-11 | |||
16 | Stefan Aigner (until 2016-07-29) | 1987-08-20 | |||
20 | Sebastian Rode (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-11 | |||
27 | Pirmin Schwegler (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-03-09 | |||
28 | Sonny Kittel (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-06 | |||
33 | Alexander Hien (until 2014-08-31) | 1993-04-03 | |||
37 | Marc Stendera (until 2013-06-30) | 1995-12-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Olivier Occean (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-10-23 | |||
10 | Erwin Hoffer (until 2013-01-29) | 1987-04-14 | |||
11 | Srdan Lakic (from 2013-01-29) (until 2014-01-30) | 1983-10-02 | |||
14 | Alexander Meier (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-01-17 | |||
18 | Mohamadou Idrissou (until 2012-07-26) | 1980-03-08 | |||
19 | Dorge Kouemaha (from 2012-08-17) (until 2013-01-22) | 1983-06-28 | |||
21 | Karim Matmour (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-06-25 | |||
29 | Rob Friend (until 2013-01-22) | 1981-01-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-19 16:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |