Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Russi Petkov (until 2014-06-30) | 1976-06-21 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Falko Gotz (from 2013-04-29) (until 2014-09-01) | 1962-03-26 | ||||
Karsten Baumann (until 2013-04-28) | 1969-10-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Mirko Reichel (from 2013-04-29) (until 2013-06-10) | 1970-12-02 | ||||
Marco Kampfe (until 2013-04-28) | 1971-11-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Martin Mannel | 1988-03-16 | |||
26 | Stephan Flauder (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-05-30 | |||
27 | Tom Neukam (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-07-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Pierre le Beau (until 2012-08-30) | 1986-03-08 | |||
3 | Tobias Nickenig (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-08-01 | |||
4 | Thomas Paulus (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-03-14 | |||
5 | Ronald Gercaliu (until 2013-12-31) | 1986-02-12 | |||
15 | Rene Klingbeil (until 2015-06-30) | 1981-04-02 | |||
21 | Dominic Rau (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-11-29 | |||
24 | Philipp Muller (from 2012-11-25) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-06-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Kevin Schlitte (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-11-04 | |||
8 | Mike Konnecke (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-08-23 | |||
10 | Michael Fink (from 2012-12-05) (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-02-01 | |||
16 | Vlad Munteanu (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-01-16 | |||
17 | Jan Hochscheidt (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-10-04 | |||
18 | Nils Miatke (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-01-30 | |||
20 | Oliver Schroder (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-06-11 | |||
22 | Marc Hensel (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-04-17 | |||
23 | Nicolas Hofler (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-03-09 | |||
25 | Guido Kocer (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-09-15 | |||
30 | Fabian Muller (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-11-06 | |||
31 | Kevin Pezzoni (from 2012-12-21) (until 2014-01-19) | 1989-03-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Ronny Konig (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-06-02 | |||
9 | Flamur Kastrati (from 2013-01-10) (until 2013-07-31) | 1991-11-14 | |||
9 | Christian Cappek (until 2012-12-02) | 1990-07-25 | |||
11 | Halil Savran (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-06-20 | |||
12 | Jakub Sylvestr (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-02-02 | |||
18 | Enrico Kern (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-03-12 | |||
19 | Patrick Sonntag (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-06-29 | |||
19 | Andreas Wiegel (from 2012-08-01) (until 2013-08-31) | 1991-07-21 | |||
28 | Max Gehrmann (from 2012-11-25) (until 2013-06-30) | 1995-05-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-19 16:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-10-30 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |