Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Zdenko Miletic (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-04-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Markus Weinzierl (until 2016-06-30) | 1974-12-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Tobias Zellner (until 2014-06-30) | 1977-09-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Beller (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-05-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Simon Jentzsch (until 2013-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | |||
21 | Alexander Manninger (from 2012-11-21) (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-06-04 | |||
30 | Mohamed Amsif (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-02-07 | |||
37 | Ioannis Gelios (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-04-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Paul Verhaegh (until 2017-08-06) | 1983-09-01 | |||
3 | Gibril Sankoh (until 2013-02-06) | 1983-05-15 | |||
4 | Dominik Reinhardt (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-12-19 | |||
5 | Ragnar Klavan (until 2016-07-20) | 1985-10-30 | |||
15 | Sebastian Langkamp (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-01-15 | |||
17 | Marcel de Jong (until 2015-01-28) | 1986-10-15 | |||
18 | Jan-Ingwer Callsen-Bracker (until 2018-01-14) | 1984-09-23 | |||
19 | Matthias Ostrzolek (until 2014-08-11) | 1990-06-05 | |||
20 | Ronny Philp (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-01-28 | |||
24 | Michael Parkhurst (from 2013-01-01) (until 2014-01-13) | 1984-01-24 | |||
32 | Raphael Framberger (from 2013-01-11) (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-09-06 | |||
32 | Matthias Strohmaier (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-03-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Kevin Vogt (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-09-23 | |||
7 | Ja-Cheol Koo (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-02-27 | |||
10 | Daniel Baier (until 2020-07-23) | 1984-05-18 | |||
11 | Milan Petrzela (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-06-19 | |||
13 | Tobias Werner (until 2016-08-02) | 1985-07-19 | |||
14 | Jan Moravek (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-11-01 | |||
16 | Andreas Ottl (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-03-01 | |||
22 | Somen Tchoyi (from 2013-01-31) (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-03-29 | |||
25 | Dawda Bah (until 2013-01-24) | 1983-11-12 | |||
26 | Lorenzo Davids (until 2012-08-30) | 1986-09-04 | |||
28 | Andre Hahn (from 2013-01-18) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
29 | Moritz Nebel (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-09-25 | |||
31 | Marco Thiede (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-05-20 | |||
34 | Pablo Pigl (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-02-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Knowledge Musona (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-06-21 | |||
9 | Torsten Oehrl (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-01-07 | |||
22 | Giovanni Sio (from 2012-07-10) (until 2013-01-30) | 1989-03-31 | |||
23 | Aristide Bance (until 2013-09-01) | 1984-09-19 | |||
27 | Dong-Won Ji (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-05-28 | |||
36 | Stephan Hain (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | |||
verliehen | |||||
33 | Sascha Molders (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-03-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2012-08-17 20:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-10-30 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-12-18 20:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |