Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Petrik Sander (until 2013-08-25) | 1960-11-17 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Thomas Hossmang (until 2014-06-30) | 1966-11-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Patrick Siefkes (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-12 | |||
12 | Steven Braunsdorf (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-01-24 | |||
30 | Tino Berbig (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-10-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Florian Giebel (from 2013-05-15) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-06-16 | |||
5 | Robert Zickert (until 2013-01-21) | 1990-03-23 | |||
13 | Ronald Wolf (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-04-23 | |||
15 | Marco Riemer (from 2012-08-10) (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-02-24 | |||
17 | Daniel Kornagel (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-06-03 | |||
22 | Gabor Dvorschak (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-09-14 | |||
24 | Justus Six (from 2013-01-31) (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-08-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Isaac Akyere (from 2013-04-06) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-11-15 | ||||
Florian Matk (until 2012-07-31) | 1992-01-03 | ||||
3 | Marius Grosch (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-03-07 | |||
4 | Marc Andris (from 2013-04-10) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-07-23 | |||
7 | Richard Kolitsch (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-10-24 | |||
8 | Matthias Pessolat (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-03-26 | |||
9 | Rene Eckardt (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-22 | |||
10 | Sebastian Alles (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-03-13 | |||
11 | Jakob Schneider (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-02-13 | |||
19 | Tom Geissler (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-09-12 | |||
20 | Marcel Schlosser (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-08-08 | |||
23 | Dennis Schulte (from 2012-08-10) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-07-05 | |||
27 | Yves Brinkmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-07-10 | |||
29 | Przemyslaw Trytko (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-08-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Dominik Bock (from 2013-04-15) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-01-20 | ||||
6 | Pascal Ibold (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-11-07 | |||
11 | Andis Shala (from 2013-01-11) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-11-15 | |||
14 | Tino Schmidt (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-10-02 | |||
18 | Daniel Barth (from 2012-11-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-12-30 | |||
24 | Sebastian Huke (until 2013-01-16) | 1989-08-11 | |||
26 | Sebastian Fries (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-01-24 | |||
27 | Maxim Banaskiewicz (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-06-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2012-08-18 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |