Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jan Maag (until 2013-06-30) | 1971-06-24 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Michael Wittwer (until 2016-06-30) | 1967-02-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Robin Kraski (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-12-19 | |||
12 | Sascha Rausch (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-03-01 | |||
14 | Oliver Nell (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-01-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Thomas Ernst (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-07-27 | |||
3 | Holger Fuchs (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-05-13 | |||
4 | Hakan Cakan (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-07-15 | |||
5 | Simon Frank (from 2013-01-30) (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-05-22 | |||
8 | Timo Brenner (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-04-03 | |||
15 | Marcel Rapp (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-04-16 | |||
23 | Sascha Paseka (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-03-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tim Fischbock (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-04-10 | ||||
Giuseppe Ricciardi (until 2012-08-08) | 1984-04-14 | ||||
6 | Felix Zachmann (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-10-22 | |||
10 | Riccardo Di Piazza (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-10-21 | |||
13 | Tobias Muller (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-07-08 | |||
13 | Reinhard Schenker (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-03-17 | |||
14 | Mario Bilger (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-06-14 | |||
16 | Maximilian Pfeiffer (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-05-01 | |||
18 | Mario Hohn (from 2013-01-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-03-28 | |||
19 | Baransel Yurttas (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-04-24 | |||
20 | Thorben Schmidt (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-07-10 | |||
21 | Viktor Karcher (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-07-20 | |||
22 | Demis Jung (until 2014-08-22) | 1988-08-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Deniz Nedzhmiev (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-05-20 | ||||
Jannik Froschauer (from 2013-01-29) (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-06-22 | ||||
9 | Leutrim Neziraj (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-07-15 | |||
11 | Niklas Hecht-Zirpel (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-08-18 | |||
18 | Metin Telle (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-19 14:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |