Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Mousalli (until 2013-06-30) | 1972-08-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Murat Salar (from 2013-02-02) (until 2013-06-30) | 1976-11-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Milos Mandic (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-05-20 | |||
12 | Florian Urbainski (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-10-07 | |||
12 | Marco Behrens (until 2012-12-31) | 1987-12-26 | |||
34 | Ercan Ates (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-01-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Murat Salar (from 2013-04-12) (until 2013-06-30) | 1976-11-23 | ||||
5 | Michel Kniat (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
6 | Dominic Krogemann (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-08-14 | |||
14 | Sedat Yucel (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-01-28 | |||
17 | Dennis Janssen (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-10-30 | |||
31 | Alexander Hessel (until 2013-01-30) | 1988-05-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Malik Gueye (until 2012-12-31) | 1990-10-24 | ||||
7 | Youness Buduar (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-03-13 | |||
10 | Mahmut Aktas (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-03-02 | |||
13 | Fabrizio Muzzicato (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-04-03 | |||
19 | Ole Laabs (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-12-15 | |||
20 | Yusuf Adewunmi (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-11-05 | |||
22 | Gokhan Aktas (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-02-16 | |||
24 | Ralf Bulang (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-02-02 | |||
26 | Nils Laabs (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-02-29 | |||
27 | Serhan Zengin (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-04-11 | |||
30 | Kevin Artmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-04-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Osei Kwarteng (from 2013-01-31) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-08-18 | ||||
Ahn Duc Nguyen (from 2013-03-08) (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-08-01 | ||||
Simon Kaars (from 2013-04-12) (until 2013-06-30) | |||||
Edmar Figueira (from 2012-08-31) (until 2012-12-31) | 1984-05-13 | ||||
8 | Mehmet-Ali Fidan (from 2013-01-05) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-07-22 | |||
8 | Soren Seidel (until 2012-12-31) | 1972-10-10 | |||
9 | Shaun Minns (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-03-11 | |||
10 | Nik Ablinger (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-07-03 | |||
11 | Erkan Kilicaslan (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-04-05 | |||
16 | Abiola Folarin (until 2013-07-29) | 1993-07-13 | |||
18 | Omer Aktas (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-01-21 | |||
23 | Benedetto Muzzicato (until 2013-06-30) | 1978-09-27 | |||
24 | Choco (from 2013-03-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-04 | |||
28 | Patrick Chwiendacz (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-01-22 | |||
31 | Bekim Murati (from 2013-01-31) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-06-19 | |||
32 | Onur Ayik (from 2013-02-10) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-28 | |||
33 | Bertrand Bingana (from 2012-07-25) (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-01-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2012-08-18 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |