Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Holger Gehrke (until 2014-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jens Keller (from 2012-12-16) (until 2014-10-07) | 1970-11-24 | ||||
Huub Stevens (until 2012-12-15) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Sven Hubscher (from 2013-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-01-26 | ||||
Seppo Eichkorn (until 2013-06-30) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Markus Gisdol (until 2012-12-15) | 1969-08-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ralf Fahrmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | |||
34 | Timo Hildebrand (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-04-05 | |||
36 | Lars Unnerstall (until 2014-01-23) | 1990-07-20 | |||
38 | Ferdinand Oswald (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Sergio Escudero (until 2013-01-24) | 1989-09-02 | |||
4 | Benedikt Howedes (until 2017-08-30) | 1988-02-29 | |||
14 | Kyriakos Papadopoulos (until 2014-08-03) | 1992-02-23 | |||
21 | Christoph Metzelder (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-11-05 | |||
22 | Atsuto Uchida (until 2017-08-21) | 1988-03-27 | |||
23 | Christian Fuchs (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-04-07 | |||
26 | Dennis Erdmann (from 2013-04-13) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-11-22 | |||
32 | Joel Matip (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-08 | |||
35 | Sead Kolasinac (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-06-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
9 | Michel Bastos (from 2013-01-29) (until 2013-08-01) | 1983-08-02 | |||
9 | Kevin-Prince Boateng (from 2013-06-29) (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-03-06 | |||
10 | Lewis Holtby (until 2013-01-27) | 1990-09-18 | |||
11 | Ibrahim Afellay (from 2012-08-31) (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-04-02 | |||
11 | Alexander Baumjohann (until 2012-08-20) | 1987-01-23 | |||
12 | Marco Hoger (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-09-16 | |||
13 | Jermaine Jones (until 2014-01-29) | 1981-11-03 | |||
15 | Vasilis Pliatsikas (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-04-14 | |||
17 | Jefferson Farfan (until 2015-08-14) | 1984-10-26 | |||
18 | Raffael (from 2013-01-16) (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-03-28 | |||
18 | Jurado (until 2012-08-30) | 1986-06-29 | |||
27 | Tranquillo Barnetta (until 2013-09-01) | 1985-05-22 | |||
28 | Christoph Moritz (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-27 | |||
29 | Max Meyer (from 2012-10-30) (until 2013-06-30) | 1995-09-18 | |||
30 | Rene Klingenburg (from 2012-12-21) (until 2015-01-23) | 1993-12-29 | |||
31 | Julian Draxler (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-09-20 | |||
33 | Roman Neustadter (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-02-18 | |||
37 | Manuel Torres (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-01-05 | |||
40 | Anthony Annan (until 2012-08-22) | 1986-07-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Ciprian Marica (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-10-02 | |||
16 | Edu (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-02-27) | 1981-11-30 | |||
16 | Edu (until 2012-08-30) | 1981-11-30 | |||
19 | Chinedu Obasi (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-06-01 | |||
20 | Teemu Pukki (until 2013-08-30) | 1990-03-29 | |||
25 | Klaas-Jan Huntelaar (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-08-12 | |||
26 | Andreas Wiegel (until 2012-07-31) | 1991-07-21 | |||
29 | Philipp Hofmann (until 2012-07-29) | 1993-03-30 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Kaan Ayhan (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-11-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-19 16:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-10-30 20:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-12-18 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |