Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jorg Sievers (until 2014-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Mirko Slomka (until 2013-12-27) | 1967-09-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Nestor El Maestro (until 2013-12-27) | 1983-03-25 | ||||
Norbert Duwel (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-01-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ron-Robert Zieler (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-02-12 | |||
14 | Markus Miller (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-04-08 | |||
21 | Samuel Radlinger (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-11-07 | |||
32 | Marcel Klonz (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-04-28 | |||
40 | Marek Grosse (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-04-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Karim Haggui (until 2013-09-01) | 1984-01-20 | |||
4 | Hiroki Sakai (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-04-12 | |||
5 | Mario Eggimann (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-01-24 | |||
6 | Steven Cherundolo (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-02-19 | |||
15 | Andre Hoffmann (from 2013-01-03) (until 2017-01-03) | 1993-02-28 | |||
17 | Johan Djourou (from 2013-01-05) (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-01-18 | |||
18 | Sebastien Pocognoli (from 2013-01-22) (until 2014-07-11) | 1987-08-01 | |||
19 | Christian Schulz (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-04-01 | |||
20 | Felipe (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-15 | |||
24 | Christian Pander (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-08-28 | |||
30 | Jannik Lohden (from 2012-12-09) (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-07-16 | |||
33 | Yannik Schulze (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-02-05 | |||
35 | Ali Gokdemir (from 2013-02-01) (until 2014-02-02) | 1991-09-17 | |||
35 | Christopher Avevor (until 2012-08-16) | 1992-02-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Leon Andreasen (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-04-23 | |||
7 | Sergio da Silva Pinto (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-10-16 | |||
8 | Manuel Schmiedebach (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-12-05 | |||
10 | Szabolcs Huszti (from 2012-07-23) (until 2014-07-16) | 1983-04-18 | |||
15 | Henning Hauger (until 2012-08-30) | 1985-07-17 | |||
16 | Franca (from 2013-01-13) (until 2013-12-31) | 1991-04-21 | |||
22 | Adrian Nikci (until 2013-10-31) | 1989-11-10 | |||
23 | Sofian Chahed (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-04-18 | |||
26 | Deniz Aycicek (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-06-05 | |||
28 | Lars Stindl (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-08-26 | |||
31 | Jannis Plaschke (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-02-06 | |||
34 | Konstantin Rausch (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-03-15 | |||
36 | Willi Evseev (from 2012-10-01) (until 2012-10-31) | 1992-02-14 | |||
37 | Sascha Schunemann (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-02-20 | |||
38 | Niko Giesselmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-09-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Artur Sobiech (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-06-12 | |||
11 | Didier Ya Konan (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-05-22 | |||
13 | Jan Schlaudraff (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-07-18 | |||
25 | Mohammed Abdellaoue (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-10-23 | |||
27 | Deniz Kadah (from 2013-01-01) (until 2014-01-30) | 1986-03-02 | |||
39 | Mame Diouf (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-12-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-19 14:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-10-31 20:30 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-12-19 20:30 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |