Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Gerald Huber (until 2013-06-30) | 1965-11-04 | ||||
Stephan Grassl (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-06-14 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Stratos (from 2013-06-11) (until 2014-06-30) | 1966-10-09 | ||||
Franciszek Smuda (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-10) | 1948-06-22 | ||||
Franz Gerber (from 2012-11-04) (until 2012-12-31) | 1953-11-27 | ||||
Oscar Corrochano (until 2012-11-03) | 1976-09-06 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Harald Gfreiter (from 2012-09-12) (until 2014-06-30) | 1974-12-03 | ||||
Marcin Broniszewski (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | |||||
Ralf Santelli (until 2012-09-11) | 1968-05-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Hofmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1972-11-03 | |||
26 | Timo Ochs (from 2013-01-23) (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-10-17 | |||
33 | Patrick Wiegers (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-04-19 | |||
37 | Armin Pillmeier (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-02-20 | |||
40 | Bernhard Hendl (from 2013-01-31) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-08-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Christian Rahn (from 2012-08-02) (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-06-15 | |||
6 | Andre Laurito (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-11-24 | |||
22 | Mario Neunaber (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-03-17 | |||
24 | Tim Erfen (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-10-22 | |||
28 | Sebastian Nachreiner (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-11-23 | |||
32 | Carlinhos (from 2013-01-15) (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-06-22 | |||
38 | Philipp Ziereis (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-03-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Jonatan Kotzke (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-03-18 | |||
10 | Romain Dedola (until 2013-01-22) | 1989-01-02 | |||
11 | Patrick Haag (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-03-09 | |||
13 | Jim-Patrick Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-08-04 | |||
17 | Oliver Hein (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-03-22 | |||
18 | Marius Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-05 | |||
20 | Denis Weidlich (until 2013-08-04) | 1986-07-08 | |||
25 | Markus Smarzoch (until 2015-01-13) | 1990-04-14 | |||
27 | Julian Wiessmeier (from 2012-08-29) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-11-04 | |||
30 | Julian de Guzman (from 2013-01-31) (until 2013-06-30) | 1981-03-25 | |||
34 | Wilson Kamavuaka (from 2012-08-30) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-03-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Abdenour Amachaibou (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-01-22 | |||
9 | Sebastian Hofmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-09-12 | |||
10 | Koke (from 2013-01-31) (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-04-27 | |||
12 | Francky Sembolo (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-08-09 | |||
14 | Thiemo-Jerome Kialka (until 2013-01-30) | 1989-01-12 | |||
19 | Koray Altinay (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-10-11 | |||
21 | Thomas Kurz (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-04-03 | |||
23 | Ramon (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-04-04 | |||
31 | Benedikt Schmid (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-11-19 | |||
35 | Pedro Beck-Gomez (from 2012-12-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-08-13 | |||
39 | Marco Djuricin (from 2012-08-09) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-12-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2012-08-20 20:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |