Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rene Keffel (until 2013-06-30) | 1968-01-14 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Rico Schmitt (from 2013-02-13) (until 2016-01-24) | 1968-09-27 | ||||
Michael Hartmann (from 2013-02-06) (until 2013-02-12) | 1971-12-06 | ||||
Arie van Lent (until 2013-02-05) | 1970-08-31 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Alexander Conrad (from 2013-02-13) (until 2014-06-30) | 1966-11-15 | ||||
Manfred Binz (until 2013-02-05) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Yannic Horn (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-02-08 | |||
16 | Daniel Endres (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-05-16 | |||
28 | Robert Wulnikowski (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-07-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Maximilian Ahlschwede (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-10 | |||
3 | Marc Stein (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-07-07 | |||
4 | Markus Husterer (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-06-16 | |||
5 | Stefan Kleineheismann (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-02-08 | |||
13 | Christopher Lamprecht (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-04-22 | |||
17 | Stefano Maier (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-12-04 | |||
22 | Daniel Dziwniel (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-08-19 | |||
23 | Marcel Stadel (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-02-16 | |||
25 | Jan Washausen (from 2013-01-18) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-10-12 | |||
27 | Sascha Korb (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-06-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Matthias Schwarz (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-12-28 | |||
8 | Sead Mehic (until 2013-06-30) | 1975-04-08 | |||
10 | Julius Reinhardt (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-03-29 | |||
14 | Lars Bender (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-01-08 | |||
15 | Theo Vogelsang (from 2013-01-21) (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-23 | |||
15 | Andre Hahn (until 2013-01-17) | 1990-08-13 | |||
18 | Philipp Fleischer (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-05-24 | |||
18 | Daniel Henrich (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-09-29 | |||
19 | Nicolas Feldhahn (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-08-14 | |||
20 | Jannik Sommer (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-09-13 | |||
21 | Marcel Avdic (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-02-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Kai Hesse (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-06-20 | |||
9 | Thomas Rathgeber (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-04-30 | |||
11 | Mathias Fetsch (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-09-30 | |||
24 | Fabian Backer (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-05-28 | |||
26 | Marcel Mosch (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-05-20 | |||
30 | Stefan Vogler (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-08-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2012-08-18 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-10-31 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-12-18 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-02-26 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |