Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Manfred Behrendt (until 2013-06-30) | 1950-10-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Pavel Dotchev (until 2013-09-05) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Babacar N'Diaye (until 2014-06-30) | 1973-12-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
12 | Hannes Frerichs (from 2012-11-17) (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-06-13 | |||
22 | Aziz Recep (from 2013-02-15) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-01-18 | |||
25 | Daniel Masuch (until 2015-06-30) | 1977-04-24 | |||
35 | Max Schulze Niehues (until 2024-06-30) | 1988-11-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Fabian Hergesell (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-12-25 | |||
4 | Robin Neupert (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-08-19 | |||
5 | Patrick Kirsch (until 2015-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | |||
6 | Kevin Schoneberg (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-08-24 | |||
16 | Dominik Schmidt (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-07-01 | |||
17 | Clement Halet (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-05-21 | |||
26 | Cuneyt Koz (from 2013-01-30) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-10-12 | |||
26 | Tommy Grupe (until 2012-12-31) | 1992-03-29 | |||
44 | Simon Scherder (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-04-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Philip Heise (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-06-20 | |||
8 | Stefan Kuhne (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-08-15 | |||
10 | Amaury Bischoff (until 2017-01-20) | 1987-03-31 | |||
15 | Mahmut Sonmez (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-25 | |||
18 | Rico Schmider (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-06-24 | |||
20 | Dennis Grote (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-08-09 | |||
21 | Jens Truckenbrod (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-02-18 | |||
23 | Pascal Koopmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-10 | |||
27 | Mehmet Kara (from 2013-01-23) (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-11-21 | |||
27 | Dennis Dowidat (until 2012-12-31) | 1990-01-10 | |||
30 | Benjamin Siegert (until 2015-06-30) | 1981-07-07 | |||
32 | Julian Buscher (until 2012-12-31) | 1993-04-22 | |||
43 | Marko Karamarko (until 2012-12-31) | 1992-03-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Matthew Taylor (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-10-17 | |||
11 | Dimitrij Nazarov (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-04-04 | |||
14 | Marco Konigs (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-25 | |||
19 | Babacar N'Diaye (until 2013-06-30) | 1973-12-12 | |||
33 | Addy Menga (from 2012-09-18) (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-09-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2012-08-19 16:00 |
4 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-10-30 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |