Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Greiber (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-10-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Peter Neururer (from 2013-04-08) (until 2014-12-09) | 1955-04-26 | ||||
Karsten Neitzel (from 2012-10-29) (until 2013-04-07) | 1967-12-17 | ||||
Andreas Bergmann (until 2012-10-27) | 1959-06-18 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Thomas Reis (until 2013-06-30) | 1973-10-04 | ||||
Dariusz Wosz (from 2013-04-08) (until 2013-06-30) | 1969-06-08 | ||||
Karsten Neitzel (until 2012-10-28) | 1967-12-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andreas Luthe (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-03-10 | |||
29 | Philipp Heerwagen (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-04-13 | |||
31 | Michael Esser (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-11-22 | |||
39 | Daniel Heuer Fernandes (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-11-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Fabian Holthaus (from 2013-05-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-01-17 | |||
4 | Marcel Maltritz (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-10-02 | |||
6 | Lukas Sinkiewicz (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-10-09 | |||
15 | Holmar Eyjolfsson (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-08-06 | |||
17 | Florian Brugmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-01-23 | |||
19 | Patrick Fabian (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-10-11 | |||
24 | Carsten Rothenbach (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-09-03 | |||
26 | Jonas Acquistapace (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-06-18 | |||
30 | Mounir Chaftar (until 2014-01-30) | 1986-01-29 | |||
30 | Michael Lumb (from 2013-01-25) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-01-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Christoph Dabrowski (until 2013-06-30) | 1978-07-01 | |||
7 | Paul Freier (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-07-26 | |||
10 | Yusuke Tasaka (from 2012-07-24) (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-07-08 | |||
12 | Michael Ortega (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-04-06 | |||
13 | Marc Rzatkowski (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-03-02 | |||
14 | Soren Bertram (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-06-05 | |||
16 | Michael Delura (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-07-01 | |||
18 | Leon Goretzka (until 2013-06-30) | 1995-02-06 | |||
20 | Faton Toski (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-02-17 | |||
23 | Christoph Kramer (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-02-19 | |||
25 | Onur Bulut (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-04-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Nikolos Gelaschwili (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-08-05 | |||
10 | Alexander Iaschwili (until 2013-06-30) | 1977-10-23 | |||
11 | Zlatko Dedic (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-10-05 | |||
21 | Kevin Scheidhauer (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-02-13 | |||
22 | Mirkan Aydin (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-07-08 | |||
27 | Selim Gunduz (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-05-16 | |||
30 | Daniel Engelbrecht (until 2013-01-01) | 1990-11-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2012-08-18 18:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2012-10-30 20:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-12-19 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-02-27 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |