Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Hilfiker (until 2014-06-30) | 1969-02-11 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Hecking (from 2012-12-22) (until 2016-10-17) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (from 2012-10-26) (until 2012-12-20) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Felix Magath (until 2012-10-25) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dirk Bremser (from 2012-12-22) (until 2015-06-30) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Andries Jonker (until 2014-06-30) | 1962-09-22 | ||||
Alexander Strehmel (from 2012-10-26) (until 2012-12-20) | 1968-03-20 | ||||
Bernd Hollerbach (until 2012-10-25) | 1969-12-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Diego Benaglio (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-09-08 | |||
21 | Patrick Drewes (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-02-04 | |||
35 | Marwin Hitz (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-09-18 | |||
43 | Marius Sauss (from 2012-08-18) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-08-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Patrick Ochs (until 2012-08-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
3 | Felipe (until 2013-01-21) | 1987-08-07 | |||
4 | Marcel Schafer (until 2017-03-01) | 1984-06-07 | |||
5 | Emanuel Pogatetz (until 2013-01-27) | 1983-01-16 | |||
16 | Sotirios Kyrgiakos (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-07-23 | |||
17 | Alexander Madlung (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-07-11 | |||
23 | Marco Russ (until 2013-01-03) | 1985-08-04 | |||
25 | Naldo (from 2012-07-19) (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-09-10 | |||
25 | Chris (until 2012-07-29) | 1978-08-25 | |||
26 | Hrvoje Cale (until 2013-01-23) | 1985-03-04 | |||
28 | Peter Pekarik (until 2012-08-30) | 1986-10-30 | |||
31 | Robin Knoche (until 2020-08-04) | 1992-05-22 | |||
32 | Fagner (from 2012-07-24) (until 2013-12-31) | 1989-06-11 | |||
34 | Ricardo Rodriguez (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-08-25 | |||
39 | Michael Schulze (until 2013-01-28) | 1989-01-13 | |||
40 | Simon Kjaer (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-03-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Slobodan Medojevic (until 2014-08-30) | 1990-11-20 | |||
7 | Josue (until 2013-03-20) | 1979-07-19 | |||
8 | Vieirinha (until 2017-08-31) | 1986-01-24 | |||
9 | Ivan Perisic (from 2013-01-06) (until 2015-08-30) | 1989-02-02 | |||
10 | Diego (until 2014-01-30) | 1985-02-28 | |||
13 | Makoto Hasebe (until 2013-09-01) | 1984-01-18 | |||
14 | Vaclav Pilar (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-10-13 | |||
15 | Christian Trasch (until 2017-08-30) | 1987-09-01 | |||
18 | Kevin Pannewitz (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-10-16 | |||
20 | Petr Jiracek (until 2012-08-27) | 1986-03-02 | |||
22 | Mateusz Klich (until 2013-01-30) | 1990-06-13 | |||
27 | Maximilian Arnold | 1994-05-27 | |||
29 | Jan Polak (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-03-14 | |||
30 | Yohandry Orozco (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-03-19 | |||
37 | Ferhan Hasani (until 2013-09-02) | 1990-06-18 | |||
38 | Thomas Kahlenberg (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-03-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Ivica Olic (until 2015-01-30) | 1979-09-14 | |||
12 | Bas Dost (until 2016-08-28) | 1989-05-31 | |||
19 | Rasmus Jonsson (until 2013-01-28) | 1990-01-27 | |||
21 | Kevin Scheidhauer (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-02-13 | |||
24 | Ashkan Dejagah (until 2012-08-30) | 1986-07-05 | |||
33 | Patrick Helmes (until 2013-08-31) | 1984-03-01 | |||
36 | Srdan Lakic (until 2013-01-28) | 1983-10-02 | |||
44 | Giovanni Sio (until 2012-07-09) | 1989-03-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2012-08-18 20:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-10-31 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2012-12-19 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-02-26 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-04-16 20:35 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |