Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Milorad Pilipovic (from 2014-04-12) (until 2016-06-30) | 1958-06-03 | ||||
Alexander Hassenstein (until 2014-06-30) | 1973-04-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
David Guy (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-12-26 | ||||
1 | Dennis Muller | 1988-09-08 | |||
1 | Dennis Muller (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-09-08 | |||
1 | Dennis Muller (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-09-08 | |||
31 | Timo Burgert (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-03-13 | |||
32 | Andreas Braun (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-02-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Meik Brand (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-02-23 | ||||
2 | Christian Kranich (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-10-22 | |||
3 | Erik Raab (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-04-11 | |||
4 | Enes Sovtic (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-06-05 | |||
5 | Nils Ehret (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-08-25 | |||
6 | Andre Olveira (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-05-01 | |||
8 | Marco Waldraff (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-02-06 | |||
11 | Bernhard Wiesler (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-09-10 | |||
13 | Felix Dreher (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-10-13 | |||
17 | Michael Schlegel (until 2016-12-06) | 1987-08-17 | |||
19 | Nico Beck (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-10-27 | |||
20 | Pierre Goppert (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
22 | Tobias Klein (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-04-13 | |||
23 | Walter Adam (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-01-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Fabian Schleusener (from 2014-01-16) (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-10-24 | ||||
3 | Colin Kanwischer (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-06-02 | |||
7 | Yannik Haringer | 1989-10-20 | |||
7 | Yannik Haringer (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-10-20 | |||
7 | Yannik Haringer (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-10-20 | |||
15 | Dominik Georg (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-06-28 | |||
21 | Dennis Buhrer (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-03-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Janis Zielinski (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-06-06 | |||
10 | Artur Fellanxa (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-06-30 | |||
14 | Gilles Ekoto-Ekoto (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-11-17 | |||
16 | Damian Kaminski (from 2014-01-01) (until 2016-01-26) | 1991-02-27 | |||
19 | Benjamin Pfahler (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-06-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2013-08-03 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |