Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
David Thiel (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-07-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Sascha Lewandowski (from 2014-04-06) (until 2014-06-30) | 1971-10-05 | ||||
Sami Hyypia (until 2014-04-05) | 1973-10-07 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Daniel Niedzkowski (until 2015-06-30) | 1976-12-14 | ||||
Jan-Moritz Lichte (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-01-12 | ||||
Peter Hyballa (from 2014-04-07) (until 2014-06-30) | 1975-12-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bernd Leno (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-03-04 | |||
22 | David Yelldell (until 2016-06-30) | 1981-10-01 | |||
25 | Palop (until 2014-06-30) | 1973-10-22 | |||
25 | Oliver Schnitzler (from 2014-06-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-10-13 | |||
36 | Niklas Lomb (until 2015-01-07) | 1993-07-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Danny da Costa (from 2014-06-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-13 | ||||
2 | Kostas Stafylidis (until 2014-07-08) | 1993-12-02 | |||
4 | Philipp Wollscheid (until 2014-09-01) | 1989-03-06 | |||
5 | Emir Spahic (until 2015-04-12) | 1980-08-18 | |||
14 | Roberto Hilbert (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-10-16 | |||
17 | Sebastian Boenisch (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-02-01 | |||
21 | Omer Toprak (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-07-21 | |||
26 | Giulio Donati (until 2016-01-25) | 1990-02-05 | |||
30 | Malcolm Cacutalua (from 2013-09-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-11-15 | |||
34 | Nico Perrey (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-02-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Stefan Reinartz (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-01-01 | |||
6 | Simon Rolfes (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-01-21 | |||
8 | Lars Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
10 | Emre Can (from 2013-08-02) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-01-12 | |||
13 | Jens Hegeler (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
15 | Levin Oztunali (until 2014-12-31) | 1996-03-15 | |||
18 | Sidney Sam (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-31 | |||
19 | Julian Brandt (from 2014-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-05-02 | |||
20 | Andres Guardado (from 2014-01-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-09-28 | |||
23 | Robbie Kruse (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-10-05 | |||
27 | Gonzalo Castro (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-06-11 | |||
29 | Luca Durholtz (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-08-18 | |||
31 | Dominik Kohr (until 2014-01-12) | 1994-01-31 | |||
32 | Jonas Meffert (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-09-04 | |||
35 | Maximilian Wagener (from 2014-03-12) (until 2014-08-31) | 1995-01-03 | |||
38 | Karim Bellarabi (until 2013-08-20) | 1990-04-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Joel Pohjanpalo (from 2013-09-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-09-13 | ||||
9 | Eren Derdiyok (from 2013-08-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-06-12 | |||
11 | Stefan Kiessling (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-01-25 | |||
16 | Arkadiusz Milik (from 2013-08-30) (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-02-28 | |||
16 | Arkadiusz Milik (until 2013-08-30) | 1994-02-28 | |||
24 | Seung-Woo Ryu (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-08-14) | 1993-12-17 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Joel Pohjanpalo (from 2013-09-02) (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-09-13 | ||||
Dominik Kohr (from 2014-01-13) (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-01-31 | ||||
Christoph Kramer (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-02-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2013-08-03 15:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-09-24 20:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-12-04 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2014-02-12 19:00 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |