Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Alexander Kunze (until 2015-06-30) | 1971-01-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Torsten Lieberknecht (until 2018-06-30) | 1973-08-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Darius Scholtysik (until 2015-06-30) | 1966-08-04 | ||||
Jurgen Rische (until 2015-06-30) | 1970-10-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marjan Petkovic (until 2015-06-30) | 1979-05-22 | |||
26 | Daniel Davari (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-06 | |||
35 | Benjamin Later (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-08-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Ermin Bicakcic (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-01-24 | |||
4 | Matthias Henn (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-04-28 | |||
5 | Benjamin Kessel (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-10-01 | |||
8 | Deniz Dogan (until 2016-06-30) | 1979-10-20 | |||
19 | Ken Reichel (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-12-19 | |||
21 | Jan Washausen (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-10-12 | |||
25 | Marcel Correia (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-05-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Lukas Kierdorf (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-12-20 | ||||
6 | Damir Vrancic (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-10-04 | |||
7 | Bjorn Kluft (until 2013-08-27) | 1990-01-11 | |||
10 | Mirko Boland (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-04-23 | |||
11 | Jan Hochscheidt (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-10-04 | |||
14 | Omar Elabdellaoui (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-12-05 | |||
15 | Norman Theuerkauf (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-01-24 | |||
17 | Kevin Kratz (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-01-21 | |||
22 | Salim Khelifi (from 2014-01-30) (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-01-26 | |||
23 | Jonas Erwig-Druppel (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-07-20 | |||
24 | Timo Perthel (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-02-11 | |||
27 | Gianluca Korte (until 2015-01-15) | 1990-08-29 | |||
31 | Marc Pfitzner (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-08-28 | |||
33 | Marco Caligiuri (until 2014-08-21) | 1984-04-14 | |||
38 | Karim Bellarabi (from 2013-08-21) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-04-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Havard Nielsen (from 2014-01-05) (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-07-15 | |||
9 | Orhan Ademi (until 2015-01-15) | 1991-10-28 | |||
12 | Domi Kumbela (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-04-20 | |||
18 | Simeon Jackson (until 2014-01-30) | 1987-03-28 | |||
20 | Torsten Oehrl (until 2015-08-31) | 1986-01-07 | |||
32 | Dennis Kruppke (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-04-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-08-04 14:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |