Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Brano Arsenovic (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-07-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ralph Hasenhuttl (from 2013-10-07) (until 2016-06-30) | 1967-08-09 | ||||
Michael Henke (from 2013-10-01) (until 2013-10-06) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Marco Kurz (until 2013-09-30) | 1969-05-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Henke (from 2013-10-07) (until 2014-06-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Michael Henke (until 2013-09-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ramazan Ozcan (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-06-28 | |||
33 | Andre Weis (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
38 | Thomas Reichlmayr (from 2013-09-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-04-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Leon Jessen (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-06-11 | |||
4 | Andre Mijatovic (until 2015-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | |||
15 | Danilo Soares (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-10-29 | |||
19 | Malte Metzelder (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-05-19 | |||
21 | Danny da Costa (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-13 | |||
22 | Konstantin Engel (from 2013-09-12) (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-07-27 | |||
26 | Ralph Gunesch (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-09-02 | |||
34 | Marvin Matip (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-09-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Alper Uludag (until 2013-08-27) | 1990-12-11 | |||
6 | Alfredo Morales (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-05-12 | |||
7 | Christoph Knasmullner (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-04-30 | |||
8 | Roger (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-08-10 | |||
14 | Umit Korkmaz (until 2013-12-31) | 1985-09-17 | |||
16 | Andreas Buchner (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-05-15 | |||
20 | Pascal Gross (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-06-15 | |||
30 | Tamas Hajnal (from 2013-08-01) (until 2014-08-27) | 1981-03-15 | |||
36 | Almog Cohen (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-09-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Moritz Hartmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-06-20 | |||
11 | Collin Quaner (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-06-18 | |||
14 | Stefan Lex (from 2014-01-17) (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-11-27 | |||
17 | Manuel Schaffler (until 2014-01-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
18 | Christian Eigler (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-01-01 | |||
23 | Reagy Ofosu (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-09-10 | |||
25 | Karl-Heinz Lappe (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-09-14 | |||
28 | Philipp Hofmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-03-30 | |||
31 | Caiuby (until 2014-07-10) | 1988-07-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2013-08-03 15:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-09-25 19:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-12-04 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |