Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Holger Gehrke (until 2014-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jens Keller (until 2014-10-07) | 1970-11-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Sven Hubscher (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-01-26 | ||||
Peter Hermann (until 2014-06-30) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Lars Unnerstall (from 2014-06-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-07-20 | ||||
1 | Ralf Fahrmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | |||
34 | Timo Hildebrand (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-04-05 | |||
36 | Lars Unnerstall (until 2014-01-23) | 1990-07-20 | |||
38 | Ferdinand Oswald (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Tim Hoogland (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-06-11 | |||
3 | Jan Kirchhoff (from 2014-01-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-10-01 | |||
4 | Benedikt Howedes (until 2017-08-30) | 1988-02-29 | |||
5 | Felipe Santana (until 2015-01-30) | 1986-03-17 | |||
6 | Sead Kolasinac (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-06-20 | |||
14 | Kyriakos Papadopoulos (until 2014-08-03) | 1992-02-23 | |||
15 | Dennis Aogo (from 2013-08-29) (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-01-14 | |||
22 | Atsuto Uchida (until 2017-08-21) | 1988-03-27 | |||
23 | Christian Fuchs (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-04-07 | |||
26 | Dennis Erdmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-11-22 | |||
31 | Philipp Max (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-09-30 | |||
32 | Joel Matip (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-08 | |||
35 | Marcel Sobottka (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-04-25 | |||
37 | Pascal Itter (until 2015-08-05) | 1995-04-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Kim Sane (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-01-20 | ||||
7 | Max Meyer (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-09-18 | |||
8 | Leon Goretzka (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-02-06 | |||
9 | Kevin-Prince Boateng (from 2013-08-30) (until 2015-12-31) | 1987-03-06 | |||
9 | Michel Bastos (until 2013-08-01) | 1983-08-02 | |||
10 | Julian Draxler (until 2015-08-31) | 1993-09-20 | |||
11 | Christian Clemens (until 2015-01-06) | 1991-08-04 | |||
12 | Marco Hoger (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-09-16 | |||
13 | Jermaine Jones (until 2014-01-29) | 1981-11-03 | |||
17 | Jefferson Farfan (until 2015-08-14) | 1984-10-26 | |||
19 | Leroy Sane (from 2014-01-01) (until 2016-08-02) | 1996-01-11 | |||
27 | Robert Leipertz (from 2013-12-15) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-02-01 | |||
27 | Tranquillo Barnetta (until 2013-09-01) | 1985-05-22 | |||
30 | Rene Klingenburg (until 2015-01-23) | 1993-12-29 | |||
33 | Roman Neustadter (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-02-18 | |||
40 | Anthony Annan (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-07-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
18 | Gerald Asamoah (until 2014-06-30) | 1978-10-03 | |||
19 | Chinedu Obasi (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-06-01 | |||
20 | Teemu Pukki (until 2013-08-30) | 1990-03-29 | |||
25 | Klaas-Jan Huntelaar (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-08-12 | |||
28 | Adam Szalai (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-12-09 | |||
29 | Donis Avdijaj (from 2014-02-01) (until 2015-01-12) | 1996-08-25 | |||
39 | Tim Bodenroder (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-01-15 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Kaan Ayhan (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-11-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2013-08-05 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-09-25 20:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-12-03 20:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |