Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Oliver Reck (until 2014-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Oliver Reck (from 2014-02-12) (until 2015-02-23) | 1965-02-27 | ||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Mike Buskens (until 2013-11-30) | 1968-03-19 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Uwe Klein (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-01-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Rensing (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
33 | Fabian Giefer (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-05-17 | |||
38 | Robin Heller (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-12-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Cristian Ramirez (until 2015-01-27) | 1994-08-12 | |||
3 | Leon Balogun (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-06-28 | |||
4 | Stelios Malezas (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-03-11 | |||
5 | Juanan (until 2013-08-14) | 1987-04-27 | |||
6 | Dustin Bomheuer (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-04-17 | |||
8 | Heinrich Schmidtgal (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-11-20 | |||
11 | Axel Bellinghausen (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-05-17 | |||
14 | Bruno Soares (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-08-21 | |||
19 | Tobias Levels (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-11-22 | |||
28 | Martin Latka (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-09-28 | |||
31 | Christian Weber (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-09-15 | |||
34 | Muhammet Karpuz (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-03-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Michael Liendl (from 2014-01-31) (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-10-25 | |||
7 | Oliver Fink (until 2020-06-30) | 1982-06-06 | |||
10 | Lewan Qenia (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-18 | |||
13 | Adam Bodzek (until 2024-06-30) | 1985-09-07 | |||
13 | Samuel Piette (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-11-12 | |||
15 | Ivan Paurevic (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-07-01 | |||
17 | Andreas Lambertz (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-10-15 | |||
18 | Mathis Bolly (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-11-14 | |||
21 | Christian Gartner (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-04-03 | |||
23 | Ben Halloran (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-06-14 | |||
25 | Tugrul Erat (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-06-17 | |||
26 | Eren Taskin (from 2013-12-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-08-26 | |||
29 | Aliosman Aydin (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-02-06 | |||
32 | Bastian Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-07-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Erwin Hoffer (from 2013-08-21) (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-04-14 | |||
16 | Gerrit Wegkamp (until 2014-01-30) | 1993-04-13 | |||
22 | Giannis Gianniotas (until 2014-08-28) | 1993-04-29 | |||
26 | Timo Furuholm (until 2013-08-15) | 1987-10-11 | |||
27 | Stefan Reisinger (until 2014-01-06) | 1981-09-14 | |||
30 | Aristide Bance (from 2013-09-02) (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-09-19 | |||
35 | Charlison Benschop (from 2013-07-07) (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-08-21 | |||
36 | Timm Golley (from 2014-02-22) (until 2015-01-04) | 1991-02-17 | |||
36 | Timm Golley (from 2014-02-14) (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-02-17 | |||
37 | Ihlas Bebou (until 2017-08-30) | 1994-04-23 | |||
39 | Genki Omae (until 2013-08-11) | 1989-12-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-08-04 16:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |