Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Theo Schneider (until 2014-04-08) | 1960-08-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marcel Holscher | 1991-06-12 | |||
21 | Alexander Hahnemann (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-06-06 | |||
31 | Mario Grevelhorster (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-07-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Cihad Kucukyagci (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-05-24 | |||
3 | Sebastian Sumelka (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-04-20 | |||
4 | David Czyszczon (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-09-04 | |||
5 | Jeffrey Volkmer (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-07-22 | |||
11 | Mariusz Rogowski (until 2018-06-30) | 1979-11-08 | |||
15 | Franck Njambe (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-10-24 | |||
20 | Mitja Schierbaum (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-05-17 | |||
25 | Julian Stiens (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-04-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Carsten Strickmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-11-09 | |||
8 | Kamil Bednarski (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-10-11 | |||
10 | Kaoa Aosman (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-02-10 | |||
14 | Mats Brune | 2005-04-28 | |||
14 | Saban Kaptan (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-04-10 | |||
17 | Stefan Langemann (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-07-11 | |||
22 | Tim Knetsch (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-11-11 | |||
23 | Oliver Zech (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-01-31 | |||
30 | Massih Wassey (from 2013-08-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-06-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Sandro Jurado Garcia (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-12-27 | |||
9 | Dominik Jansen (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-01-30 | |||
12 | Nick Brisevac (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-01-13 | |||
18 | Marwin Studtrucker (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-04-29 | |||
24 | Soner Dayangan (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-01-17 | |||
33 | Wojciech Pollok (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-06-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-08-04 16:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-09-24 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |