Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Frederik Gossling (until 2015-06-30) | 1977-09-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Frank Kramer (until 2015-02-23) | 1972-05-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Mirko Dickhaut (until 2015-06-30) | 1971-01-11 | ||||
Tobias Gitschier (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-05-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Wolfgang Hesl (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-01-13 | |||
30 | Mark Flekken (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-06-13 | |||
39 | Tom Mickel (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-04-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Benedikt Rocker (from 2014-01-10) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-11-19 | |||
3 | Zsolt Korcsmar (from 2013-07-15) (until 2016-02-01) | 1989-01-09 | |||
4 | Kevin Kraus (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-08-12 | |||
5 | Mergim Mavraj (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-06-09 | |||
15 | Michael Hefele (until 2014-01-14) | 1990-09-01 | |||
18 | Abdul Rahman Baba (until 2014-08-12) | 1994-07-02 | |||
19 | Thomas Kleine (until 2015-02-22) | 1977-12-28 | |||
23 | Kevin Schulze (until 2013-12-31) | 1992-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Tim Sparv (until 2014-07-02) | 1987-02-20 | |||
7 | Zoltan Stieber (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-10-16 | |||
8 | Stephan Furstner (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-09-11 | |||
11 | Dominick Drexler (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-05-26 | |||
13 | Sebastian Tyrala (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-02-22 | |||
14 | Tom Weilandt (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-04-27 | |||
16 | Goran Sukalo (until 2016-02-01) | 1981-08-24 | |||
17 | Thomas Pledl (until 2015-01-10) | 1994-05-23 | |||
20 | Daniel Brosinski (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-07-17 | |||
21 | Robert Zillner (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-08-04 | |||
22 | Thanos Petsos (until 2013-07-14) | 1991-06-05 | |||
27 | Florian Trinks (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-03-11 | |||
31 | Niko Giesselmann (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-09-26 | |||
32 | Jung-Bin Park (until 2013-08-31) | 1994-02-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Kacper Przybylko (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-03-25 | ||||
9 | Ognjen Mudrinski (until 2014-08-30) | 1991-11-15 | |||
10 | Nikola Djurdjic (until 2014-07-02) | 1986-04-01 | |||
22 | Niclas Fullkrug (from 2013-08-24) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-02-09 | |||
24 | Djiby Fall (until 2013-09-01) | 1985-04-20 | |||
25 | Stefan Lex (until 2014-01-16) | 1989-11-27 | |||
33 | Ilir Azemi (until 2017-01-30) | 1992-02-21 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Kevin Schulze (from 2014-01-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-01-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-08-04 14:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-09-24 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |