Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rolf Meyer (until 2014-06-30) | 1955-10-03 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Maik Walpurgis (until 2015-08-24) | 1973-10-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ovid Hajou (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-11-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
20 | Nils Zumbeel (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-01-19 | |||
24 | Daniel Heuer Fernandes (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-11-13 | |||
28 | Frank Lehmann (from 2013-09-02) (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-04-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Marcel Stadel (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-02-16 | |||
4 | Florian Krebs (from 2014-01-31) (until 2014-08-30) | 1988-11-15 | |||
5 | David Pisot (until 2016-08-15) | 1987-07-06 | |||
6 | Alexander Krük (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-01-21 | |||
16 | Steven Bentka (from 2014-02-22) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-04-13 | |||
21 | Paul Thomik (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-01-25 | |||
23 | Michael Hohnstedt (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-05-03 | |||
29 | Sebastian Neumann (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-02-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Timo Kunert (from 2013-09-02) (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-03-12 | |||
7 | Massimo Ornatelli (from 2013-07-26) (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-01-17 | |||
8 | Jerry Karikari (from 2013-08-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-07-23 | |||
8 | Timo Staffeldt (until 2013-08-08) | 1984-02-09 | |||
10 | Daniel Nagy (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-03-15 | |||
11 | Michael Blum (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-12-25 | |||
19 | Nicolas Feldhahn (until 2015-08-26) | 1986-08-14 | |||
22 | Yannic Thiel (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-10-22 | |||
25 | Daniel Latkowski (until 2013-08-29) | 1991-11-11 | |||
27 | Erik Zenga (from 2013-08-21) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
31 | Tom Merkens (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-01-20 | |||
32 | Andreas Glockner (from 2014-01-23) (until 2015-02-01) | 1988-02-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Francky Sembolo (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-08-09 | ||||
9 | Andreas Spann (from 2013-07-14) (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-05-17 | |||
13 | Roman Prokoph (until 2014-01-30) | 1985-08-06 | |||
14 | Stanislav Iljutcenko (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
15 | Mehmet Kodes (from 2013-11-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-06-21 | |||
17 | Christian Pauli (until 2014-07-21) | 1992-01-30 | |||
18 | Adriano Grimaldi (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-04-05 | |||
26 | Marcel Kunstmann (until 2014-01-30) | 1988-06-06 | |||
30 | Dennis Wegner (from 2013-07-19) (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-01-10 | |||
30 | Gaetano Manno (until 2013-07-15) | 1982-07-26 | |||
33 | Malte Nieweler (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-04-10 | |||
37 | Pascal Testroet (from 2013-08-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-09-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2013-08-02 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-09-25 20:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |