Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Hilfiker (until 2014-06-30) | 1969-02-11 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Hecking (until 2016-10-17) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dirk Bremser (until 2015-06-30) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Andries Jonker (until 2014-06-30) | 1962-09-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Diego Benaglio (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-09-08 | |||
20 | Max Grun (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-04-05 | |||
21 | Patrick Drewes (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-02-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Patrick Ochs (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
3 | Dan-Patrick Poggenberg (from 2013-12-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-03-28 | |||
4 | Marcel Schafer (until 2017-03-01) | 1984-06-07 | |||
5 | Timm Klose (until 2016-01-17) | 1988-05-09 | |||
25 | Naldo (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-09-10 | |||
26 | Felipe (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-08-07 | |||
31 | Robin Knoche (until 2020-08-04) | 1992-05-22 | |||
32 | Fagner (until 2013-12-31) | 1989-06-11 | |||
34 | Ricardo Rodriguez (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-08-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tolga Cigerci (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-03-23 | ||||
6 | Slobodan Medojevic (until 2014-08-30) | 1990-11-20 | |||
7 | Daniel Caligiuri (until 2017-01-24) | 1988-01-15 | |||
8 | Vieirinha (until 2017-08-31) | 1986-01-24 | |||
9 | Ivan Perisic (until 2015-08-30) | 1989-02-02 | |||
10 | Diego (until 2014-01-30) | 1985-02-28 | |||
13 | Makoto Hasebe (until 2013-09-01) | 1984-01-18 | |||
14 | Kevin De Bruyne (from 2014-01-18) (until 2015-08-30) | 1991-06-28 | |||
14 | Tolga Cigerci (until 2013-09-01) | 1992-03-23 | |||
15 | Christian Trasch (until 2017-08-30) | 1987-09-01 | |||
18 | Ja-Cheol Koo (until 2014-01-17) | 1989-02-27 | |||
19 | Junior Malanda (from 2014-01-01) (until 2015-01-10) | 1994-08-28 | |||
22 | Luiz Gustavo (from 2013-08-16) (until 2017-07-04) | 1987-07-23 | |||
27 | Maximilian Arnold | 1994-05-27 | |||
29 | Jan Polak (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-03-14 | |||
32 | Willi Evseev (from 2013-10-20) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-02-14 | |||
37 | Ferhan Hasani (until 2013-09-02) | 1990-06-18 | |||
39 | Paul Seguin (from 2014-02-08) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-03-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Ivica Olic (until 2015-01-30) | 1979-09-14 | |||
12 | Bas Dost (until 2016-08-28) | 1989-05-31 | |||
17 | Kevin Scheidhauer (until 2014-08-30) | 1992-02-13 | |||
17 | Giovanni Sio (until 2013-08-15) | 1989-03-31 | |||
28 | Rasmus Jonsson (until 2013-08-08) | 1990-01-27 | |||
30 | Stefan Kutschke (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-11-03 | |||
33 | Patrick Helmes (until 2013-08-31) | 1984-03-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2013-08-03 20:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-09-24 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2013-12-04 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2014-02-12 19:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2014-04-15 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |