Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Gerry Ehrmann (until 2015-06-30) | 1959-02-18 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Kosta Runjaic (until 2015-09-23) | 1971-06-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ilija Gruev (until 2015-06-30) | 1969-10-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tobias Sippel (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-03-22 | |||
22 | Julian Pollersbeck (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-08-16 | |||
32 | Marius Muller (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-07-12 | |||
35 | Raphael Sallinger (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-12-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Leon Jessen (from 2015-06-29) (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-06-11 | ||||
- | Enis Hajri (until 2014-08-26) | 1983-03-06 | |||
3 | Tim Heubach (from 2014-07-15) (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-05-12 | |||
4 | Willi Orban (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-11-03 | |||
7 | Michael Schulze (until 2016-08-31) | 1989-01-13 | |||
13 | Florian Riedel (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-04-09 | |||
15 | Marc Torrejon (until 2014-08-26) | 1986-02-18 | |||
17 | Andre Fomitschow (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-09-07 | |||
31 | Chris Lowe (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-04-16 | |||
33 | Dominique Heintz (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-08-15 | |||
38 | Michael Schindele (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-01-27 | |||
39 | Jean Zimmer (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-12-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus Karl (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-02-14 | ||||
5 | Kerem Demirbay (from 2014-09-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-07-03 | |||
6 | Alexander Ring (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-04-09 | |||
11 | Ruben Jenssen (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-05-04 | |||
18 | Erik Thommy (from 2015-01-11) (until 2016-01-31) | 1994-08-20 | |||
19 | Marcel Gaus (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-08-02 | |||
20 | Kevin Stoger (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-08-27 | |||
23 | Mateusz Klich (from 2015-01-09) (until 2016-08-26) | 1990-06-13 | |||
26 | Steven Zellner (until 2015-02-01) | 1991-03-14 | |||
28 | Amin Younes (from 2014-08-22) (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-08-06 | |||
28 | Kostas Fortounis (until 2014-07-20) | 1992-10-16 | |||
30 | Christopher Drazan (until 2014-08-26) | 1990-10-02 | |||
36 | Manfred Osei Kwadwo (until 2016-08-04) | 1995-05-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Stefan Mugosa (from 2014-07-03) (until 2015-01-26) | 1992-02-26 | |||
9 | Simon Zoller (from 2015-01-31) (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-06-26 | |||
9 | Srdan Lakic (until 2015-01-29) | 1983-10-02 | |||
10 | Philipp Hofmann (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-03-30 | |||
14 | Sebastian Jacob (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-06-26 | |||
16 | Karim Matmour (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-06-25 | |||
25 | Olivier Occean (until 2014-11-09) | 1981-10-23 | |||
35 | Jan-Lucas Dorow (until 2015-01-30) | 1993-04-26 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Leon Jessen (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-06-11 | ||||
Ariel Borysiuk (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-07-29 | ||||
Jan-Lucas Dorow (from 2015-01-30) (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-04-26 | ||||
Christopher Drazan (from 2014-08-27) (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-10-02 | ||||
Stefan Mugosa (from 2015-01-27) (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-02-26 | ||||
Enis Hajri (from 2014-08-27) (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-03-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2014-08-16 18:00 |
3 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2014-10-28 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-03-03 19:00 |
2 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |