Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Martin Schmidt (from 2015-02-17) (until 2017-05-22) | 1967-04-12 | ||||
Kasper Hjulmand (until 2015-02-17) | 1972-04-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Stefanos Kapino (from 2014-07-16) (until 2015-07-15) | 1994-03-18 | |||
21 | Loris Karius (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-06-22 | |||
38 | Robin Zentner (until 2015-08-26) | 1994-10-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Gonzalo Jara (from 2014-07-16) (until 2016-01-16) | 1985-08-29 | |||
3 | Philipp Wollscheid (from 2014-09-01) (until 2015-01-02) | 1989-03-06 | |||
4 | Nikolce Noveski (until 2015-06-30) | 1979-04-28 | |||
5 | Benedikt Saller (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-09-22 | |||
7 | Pierre Bengtsson (from 2015-01-01) (until 2016-08-29) | 1988-04-12 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell | 1991-08-24 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | |||
18 | Daniel Brosinski (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-07-17 | |||
20 | Junior Diaz (until 2015-06-30) | 1983-09-12 | |||
24 | Joo-Ho Park (until 2015-08-29) | 1987-01-16 | |||
26 | Niko Bungert (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-10-24 | |||
32 | Damian Rossbach (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-02-27 | |||
39 | Fabian Kalig (from 2015-01-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-03-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Johannes Geis (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-08-17 | |||
7 | Niki Zimling (until 2014-08-31) | 1985-04-19 | |||
8 | Christoph Moritz (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-01-27 | |||
10 | Filip Djuricic (from 2014-07-23) (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-01-30 | |||
11 | Yunus Malli (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-02-24 | |||
13 | Ja-Cheol Koo (until 2015-08-31) | 1989-02-27 | |||
14 | Julian Baumgartlinger (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-01-02 | |||
15 | Pablo de Blasis (from 2014-08-31) (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-02-04 | |||
17 | Jairo Samperio (until 2018-01-01) | 1993-07-11 | |||
19 | Elkin Soto (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-08-04 | |||
22 | Julian Koch (until 2015-01-04) | 1990-11-11 | |||
27 | Christian Clemens (from 2015-01-06) (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-04 | |||
27 | Nicolai Muller (until 2014-08-05) | 1987-09-25 | |||
28 | Todor Nedelew (until 2016-01-22) | 1993-02-07 | |||
29 | Devante Parker (until 2017-01-30) | 1996-03-16 | |||
30 | Patrick Pflucke (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-11-30 | |||
31 | Jonas Hofmann (from 2014-09-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-07-14 | |||
33 | Chinedu Ede (until 2014-08-22) | 1987-02-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Sami Allagui (from 2014-09-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-05-28 | |||
9 | Sebastian Polter (until 2014-08-30) | 1991-04-01 | |||
17 | Dani Schahin (until 2014-08-26) | 1989-07-09 | |||
22 | Nicolas Castillo (from 2015-01-28) (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-02-14 | |||
23 | Shinji Okazaki (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-04-16 | |||
35 | Petar Sliskovic (until 2015-02-02) | 1991-02-21 | |||
36 | Nikita Rukavytsya (until 2014-10-12) | 1987-06-22 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Niki Zimling (from 2014-09-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-04-19 | ||||
Julian Koch (from 2015-01-05) (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-11-11 | ||||
Sebastian Polter (from 2014-08-31) (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-04-01 | ||||
Dani Schahin (from 2014-08-26) (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-07-09 | ||||
Chinedu Ede (from 2014-08-23) (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-02-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2014-08-15 19:00 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |